This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:48:57 (UTC).

Crowley v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Crowley filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00035

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kelly K.E. Mahoney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMES J. CROWLEY

James J Crowley

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. RICHARD JOHNSON

Attorney at JOHNSON & LEGISLADOR, P.L.C.

1636 42Nd Street, N.E.

Cedar Rapids, IA 52402

J Richard Johnson

Attorney at Johnson and Legislador, PLC

1636 42Nd Street Ne, Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52402

Defendant Attorneys

Elvi D Jenkins

Attorney at Social Security Administration

1301 Young Street, Suite A702, Ecf

Dallas, TX 75202

Jacob A Schunk

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

111 7Th Avenue Se, Box 1, Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SOCIAL Security Briefing Schedule Order. Pursuant to 42 USC Sec. 405(g) and Local Rule 16(d)(1), this case will be submitted to the Court as follows: Plaintiff proposed stipulation of facts to Defendant (not filed with Court) not later than 30 days from this date. Defendant response to Plaintiff not later than 60 days. Statement of Facts due for filing by 8/24/2019. Plaintiff's Brief due by 9/8/2019. Defendant's Brief due by 10/8/2019. Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2019. (pac) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET Annotation re #10 Social Security Transcript Vol 1, and #11 Social Security Transcript Vol 2. Tabbed and bound hard copies of two volumes of transcripts received, and housed in SC Clerk's office. (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SOCIAL Security Briefing Schedule Order. Pursuant to 42 USC Sec. 405(g) and Local Rule 16(d)(1), this case will be submitted to the Court as follows: Plaintiff proposed stipulation of facts to Defendant (not filed with Court) not later than 30 days from this date. Defendant response to Plaintiff not later than 60 days. Statement of Facts due for filing by 8/24/2019. Plaintiff's Brief due by 9/8/2019. Defendant's Brief due by 10/8/2019. Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2019. (pac) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SOCIAL Security Transcript Filed (Part 2 of 2) (Attachments: #1 Transcript Part 15 of 22, #2 Transcript Part 16 of 22, #3 Transcript Part 17 of 22, #4 Transcript Part 2 of 22Transcript Part 18 of 22, #5 Transcript Part 19 of 22, #6 Transcript Part 20 of 22, #7 Transcript Part 21 of 22, #8 Transcript Part 22 of 22) (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SOCIAL Security Transcript Filed (Part 1 of 2) (Attachments: #1 Transcript Part 2 of 22, #2 Transcript Part 3 of 22, #3 Transcript Part 4 of 22, #4 Transcript Part 5 of 22, #5 Transcript Part 6 of 22, #6 Transcript Part 7 of 22, #7 Transcript Part 8 of 22, #8 Transcript Part 9 of 22, #9 Transcript Part 10 of 22, #10 Transcript Part 11 of 22, #11 Transcript Part 12 of 22, #12 Transcript Part 13 of 22) (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Transcript e-filed separately) by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Elvi D Jenkins on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Jenkins, Elvi) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Upon consent of the parties Commissioner of Social Security and James J Crowley, this case is assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney for final disposition. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 4/19/19. (ksy) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James J Crowley re #1 Complaint Certified Returned Receipts for Process Service of Complaint (Johnson, J) Modified text on 4/22/2019 (pac). (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by James J Crowley Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (Johnson, J) Modified text on 4/22/2019 (pac). (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Social Security Case Packet) (pac) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 4/24/2019. (pac) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2902228.), filed by James J Crowley. Scheduling Report due by 6/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, J) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elvi D. Jenkins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob A Schunk