This case was last updated from PACER on 01/02/2021 at 08:16:07 (UTC).

Crowdis v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 Crowdis filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams and Charles R. Wolle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00339

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Wolle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Crowdis

Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce H. Stoltze, Jr.

Attorney at STOLTZE & STOLTZE, PLC

300 Walnut Street, Suite 260

Des Moines, IA 50309

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew P. Pappas

Attorney at PAPPAS WRIGHT PC

1617 2Nd Avenue, Suite 300

Rock Island, IL 61201

Kathleen McLeod Caminiti

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP (NJ)

430 Mountain Avenue, Suite 303

Murray Hill, NJ 07974

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Crowdis (Stoltze, Bruce) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

6 #2

Affidavit Declaration of Anita Steward

6 #1

Brief in Support

#6

(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 11/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Anita Steward)(Caminiti, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4298003 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Caminiti, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Pursuant to Local Rule 81 (Pappas, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Pappas, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

1 #1

Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthew Wells Fargo from Polk County, case number 05771LACL148621. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4292836., filed by Matthew Wells Fargo. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Pappas, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (kjw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Crowdis (Stoltze, Bruce) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 11/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Anita Steward)(Caminiti, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kathleen McLeod Caminiti. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/9/2020. (slg) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4298003 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Caminiti, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Pursuant to Local Rule 81 (Pappas, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Pappas, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthew Wells Fargo from Polk County, case number 05771LACL148621. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4292836., filed by Matthew Wells Fargo. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Pappas, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less