7:22-CV-02605
08/09/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Donald C Coggins, Jr
Eddie Dean Crowder
Blythe Construction Inc
Zachry Construction Corp
Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc
Cowan Systems LLC
John Allen Ferguson
Phillip Donald Barber
Christopher P Kenney
Richard A Harpootlian
Scott F Talley
Gerald Anderson Stein, II
Ryan Wade Conner
Tyler Paul Winton
Robert Daniel Moseley, Jr
William Shafter Jackson, IV
(#29) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint Response filed by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc. (Winton, Tyler) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint Response filed by Eddie Dean Crowder.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/28/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Barber, Phillip) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
(#27) NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Pretrial Telephone Conference, Thursday October 20, 2022 @ 10:30am cancelled and rescheduled to: Pretrial Telephone Conference set for 10/25/2022 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. (alew, ) (alew, ). (Entered: 09/20/2022)
(#26) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Telephone Conference. Conference set for Thursday, October 20, 2022 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/19/22. (alew, ) (Main Document 26 replaced on 9/19/2022) (alew, ). Modified on 9/19/2022 to replace with corrected document per clerk (signed date) (alew, ). (Entered: 09/19/2022)
(#25) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/11/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/5/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/28/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/27/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/16/2023, Discovery due by 3/20/2023, Motions due by 4/3/2023, Mediation Due by 4/17/2023, Motion in Limine due by 5/17/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/26/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 6/16/2023. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/19/22. (alew, ) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
(#24) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Winton, Tyler) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
(#23) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Blythe Construction Inc, Zachry Construction Corp.(Stein, Gerald) (Entered: 09/09/2022)
(#20) MOTION to Strike Certain Allegations in #1 Complaint by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/21/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Winton, Tyler) Modified on 9/8/2022 to edit text (alew, ). (Entered: 09/07/2022)
Main Document
Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service
Main Document
Summons Zachry Construction Inc
Summons Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc
Summons John Allen Ferguson
Summons Cowan Systems LLC
Main Document
(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Eddie Dean Crowder.(alew, ) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
(#20) MOTION to Strike Certain Allegations in #1 Complaint by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/21/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Winton, Tyler) Modified on 9/8/2022 to edit text (alew, ). (Entered: 09/07/2022)
Docket(#29) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint Response filed by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc. (Winton, Tyler) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint Response filed by Eddie Dean Crowder.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/28/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Barber, Phillip) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#27) NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Pretrial Telephone Conference, Thursday October 20, 2022 @ 10:30am cancelled and rescheduled to: Pretrial Telephone Conference set for 10/25/2022 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. (alew, ) (alew, ). (Entered: 09/20/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#26) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Telephone Conference. Conference set for Thursday, October 20, 2022 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/19/22. (alew, ) (Main Document 26 replaced on 9/19/2022) (alew, ). Modified on 9/19/2022 to replace with corrected document per clerk (signed date) (alew, ). (Entered: 09/19/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#25) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/11/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/5/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/28/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/27/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/16/2023, Discovery due by 3/20/2023, Motions due by 4/3/2023, Mediation Due by 4/17/2023, Motion in Limine due by 5/17/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/26/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 6/16/2023. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/19/22. (alew, ) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Winton, Tyler) (Entered: 09/14/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#23) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Blythe Construction Inc, Zachry Construction Corp.(Stein, Gerald) (Entered: 09/09/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc.(Winton, Tyler) (Entered: 09/08/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Wade Conner on behalf of Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc (Conner, Ryan) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#20) MOTION to Strike Certain Allegations in #1 Complaint by Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/21/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Winton, Tyler) Modified on 9/8/2022 to edit text (alew, ). (Entered: 09/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Daniel Moseley, Jr on behalf of Cowan Systems LLC, John Allen Ferguson (Moseley, Robert) (Entered: 09/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#15) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 5-9 Reason: attorney refiled to make correction. Corrected Filing Document Number #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 8/24/22 (alew, ) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Dean Crowder. Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc served on 8/18/2022, answer due 9/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service)(Harpootlian, Richard) Modified on 8/26/2022 to correct filing date (alew, ). (Entered: 08/25/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Dean Crowder. Zachry Construction Corp served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service)(Harpootlian, Richard) Modified on 8/26/2022 to correct filing date(alew, ). (Entered: 08/25/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Dean Crowder. John Allen Ferguson served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Acceptance of Service)(Harpootlian, Richard) Modified on 8/26/2022 to correct filing date (alew, ). (Entered: 08/25/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Dean Crowder. Cowan Systems LLC served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Acceptance of Service)(Harpootlian, Richard) Modified on 8/26/2022 to correct filing date (alew, ). (Entered: 08/25/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Dean Crowder. Blythe Construction Inc served on 8/17/2022, answer due 9/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service)(Harpootlian, Richard) Modified on 8/26/2022 to correct filing date (alew, ). (Entered: 08/25/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Summons Issued as to Blythe Construction Inc, Cowan Systems LLC, John Allen Ferguson, Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc, Zachry Construction Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cowan Systems LLC, #2 Summons John Allen Ferguson, #3 Summons Johnson Mirmiran and Thompson Inc, #4 Summons Zachry Construction Inc)(alew, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/10/2022) (alew, ). Modified on 8/10/2022 to replace summons (incorrect defendant's name spelling, Blyth-Blythe)(alew, ). (Entered: 08/10/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Eddie Dean Crowder.(alew, ) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10633622.), filed by Eddie Dean Crowder. Service due by 11/7/2022(alew, ) (Entered: 08/10/2022)
[-] Read Less