This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2019 at 07:28:33 (UTC).

Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLC v. Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02732

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLC

5675 Dtc Boulevard, Suite 170

Englewood, CO 80111

Defendants

Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, a Nebraska corporation

Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew R. Pearson

Attorney at Gravely Pearson Wollenweber Freedman LLC-San Antonio

425 Soledad, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78247

Lisa S. Greenberg

Attorney at Pearson Wollenweber Freedman LLC-Lakewood

200 Union Boulevard, Suite 200

Lakewood, CO 80228

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Carl Swanson

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff PC-Denver

700 17Th Street, Suite 1350

Denver, CO 80202

Brian Edward Devilling

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff PC-Chicago

222 North La Salle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60601-1059

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Greenberg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lisa S. Greenberg on behalf of Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLCAttorney Lisa S. Greenberg added to party Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLC(pty:pla) (Greenberg, Lisa) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew R. Pearson on behalf of Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLCAttorney Matthew R. Pearson added to party Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLC(pty:pla) (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #6 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company.(Devilling, Brian) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/30/2019. Consent Form due by 11/20/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#12

(#12) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2732-NRN (angar, ) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Brian Devilling on behalf of Defendant Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company by Steven Carl Swanson on behalf of Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company (Swanson, Steven) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven Carl Swanson on behalf of Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company (Swanson, Steven) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rsams, ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#6

(#6) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, filed by Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLC.(rsams, ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Swanson, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet Fed. Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit Ex. I-Demand Letter

1 #8

Exhibit Ex. H-Sec of State Rpt

1 #7

Exhibit Ex. G-Email

1 #6

Exhibit Ex. F-Crossrd Art Org

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, a Nebraska corporation from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2019CV33297. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6911292), filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, a Nebraska corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B-Summons, #3 Exhibit Ex. C-Civ Case Cover, #4 Exhibit Ex. D-Delay Reduction, #5 Exhibit Ex. E-Waiver Service, #6 Exhibit Ex. F-Crossrd Art Org, #7 Exhibit Ex. G-Email, #8 Exhibit Ex. H-Sec of State Rpt, #9 Exhibit Ex. I-Demand Letter, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Fed. Civil Cover Sheet)(Swanson, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Greenberg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lisa S. Greenberg on behalf of Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLCAttorney Lisa S. Greenberg added to party Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLC(pty:pla) (Greenberg, Lisa) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew R. Pearson on behalf of Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLCAttorney Matthew R. Pearson added to party Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLC(pty:pla) (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #6 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company.(Devilling, Brian) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #13 Order to Matthew Pearson, Wes P. Wollenweber, Lisa S. Greenberg at Gravely Pearson Wollenweber Freedman, LLC; 200 Union Blvd, Suite 200; Lakewood CO 80228. Text Only Entry (tsher, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/30/2019. Consent Form due by 11/20/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2732-NRN (angar, ) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #9 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Brian E. Devilling. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (angar, ) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Brian Devilling on behalf of Defendant Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company by Steven Carl Swanson on behalf of Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company (Swanson, Steven) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven Carl Swanson on behalf of Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company (Swanson, Steven) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rsams, ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, filed by Crossroads Twin Peaks, LLC.(rsams, ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#5) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#3) DISREGARD FILED IN INCORRECT CASE Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, ) Modified on 9/25/2019 to correct entry(rsams, ). (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Swanson, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, a Nebraska corporation from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2019CV33297. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6911292), filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, a Nebraska corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B-Summons, #3 Exhibit Ex. C-Civ Case Cover, #4 Exhibit Ex. D-Delay Reduction, #5 Exhibit Ex. E-Waiver Service, #6 Exhibit Ex. F-Crossrd Art Org, #7 Exhibit Ex. G-Email, #8 Exhibit Ex. H-Sec of State Rpt, #9 Exhibit Ex. I-Demand Letter, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Fed. Civil Cover Sheet)(Swanson, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Edward Devilling