This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:20:50 (UTC).

Crossland v. Bio Life Employment Services

Case Summary

On 05/05/2020 Crossland filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bio Life Employment Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Audrey G. Fleissig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00612

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Audrey G. Fleissig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

April Crossland

Defendants

Bio Life Employment Services

Bio Life Employment Services doing business as Shire Bio Life

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brent E. Labovitz

Attorney at KOLKER AND LABOVITZ LLC

7700 Bonhomme Ave, Suite 350

St. Louis, MO 63105

Scott L. Kolker

Attorney at KOLKER AND LABOVITZ LLC

7700 Bonhomme Ave, Suite 350

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendant Attorney

Justin Alexandre Reinhardt

Attorney at MANNING GROSS LLP

1405 Green Mount Road, Suite 400

O'Fallon, IL 62269

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bio Life Employment Services. (Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff April Crossland. (Labovitz, Brent) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bio Life Employment Services. (Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Bio Life Employment Services. (Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bio Life Employment Services acknowledged by the Clerk of the State Court Sent To: State Court - Executed (Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - LTR to PLT encl Notice of Removal

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bio Life Employment Services Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - LTR to PLT encl Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Combined Notice of Removal Circuit Court & Filing Conf)(Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Charles County Circuit Court, filed by April Crossland.(JWD) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Bio Life Employment Services.. (Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit G - Demand Letter

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Address

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - Original Filing Form

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Current State Docket

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Charles County Circuit Court, case number 2011-CC00283, with receipt number AMOEDC-7899218, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Bio Life Employment Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Current State Docket, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Original Filing Form, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Address, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Demand Letter)(Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bio Life Employment Services. (Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff April Crossland. (Labovitz, Brent) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bio Life Employment Services. (Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Bio Life Employment Services. (Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bio Life Employment Services acknowledged by the Clerk of the State Court Sent To: State Court - Executed (Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bio Life Employment Services Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - LTR to PLT encl Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Combined Notice of Removal Circuit Court & Filing Conf)(Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (JWD) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Charles County Circuit Court, filed by April Crossland.(JWD) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Bio Life Employment Services.. (Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Charles County Circuit Court, case number 2011-CC00283, with receipt number AMOEDC-7899218, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Bio Life Employment Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Current State Docket, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Original Filing Form, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Address, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Demand Letter)(Reinhardt, Justin) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent E. Labovitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott L. Kolker