This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2021 at 18:45:45 (UTC).

Olive AI, Inc. v. AKASA Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Olive AI, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against AKASA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05907

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Crosschx, Inc. doing business as Olive, a Delaware Corporation

Olive AI, Inc.

Crosschx, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Alpha Health, Inc., a Delaware Corporation

Alpha Health Inc.

AKASA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Marcus DeWayne Peterson

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1333 2Nd Street, Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401

John W. Crittenden

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5800

Kelley B. Harrington

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Angela Lucille Dunning

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Bobby A. Ghajar

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1333 2Nd Street, Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Andrew P. Bridges

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

Nicolas Andreas Jampol

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

Eric J. Ball

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

Nicole Medeiros

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#49

#48

#47

#46

#45

40 #1

Exhibit A

#40

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

#4

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #48 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Olive AI, Inc.. (Ghajar, Bobby) (Filed on 5/14/2021) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/25/21, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Official Reporter, telephone number 510-910-5888, e-mail joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #46 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2021. (Related documents(s) #46 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Olive AI, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Ghajar, Bobby) (Filed on 5/12/2021) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Ball (Ball, Eric) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/30/2021. As set forth in the Supplement to the Joint Case Management Statement, on March 22, 2021 Defendant Alpha Health Inc., a Delaware corporation, changed its name to AKASA Inc. (Dkt. No. #40 ) It is hereby ordered that Defendant's name, as displayed in the case caption in this proceeding, be changed from Alpha Health Inc. to AKASA Inc. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021) Modified on 3/30/2021 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held by Zoom videoconference on 3/25/2021 re #25 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses 3-5. The motion is granted with leave to amend. Any further answer/counterclaim are stayed until 6/3/2021. (Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce)(Time 00:34) The case management conference set for this date is continued to 6/3/2021 at 1:30 p.m. by videoconference. Joint case management statement shall be filed by 5/27/2021.Attorneys for Plaintiff: Angela Dunning/Bobby Ghajar/Marcus PetersonAttorneys for Defendant: Andrew P. Bridges/ Nicolas A. Jampol (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2021) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Medeiros (Medeiros, Nicole) (Filed on 3/24/2021) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas Andreas Jampol for Defendant and Counterclaimant AKASA, INC. (f/k/a ALPHA HEALTH INC.) (Jampol, Nicolas) (Filed on 3/24/2021) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) SUPPLEMENT TO JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Defendant and Counterclaimant AKASA, Inc. fka Alpha Health Inc.; Request to Modify Case Caption] filed by Alpha Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 3/23/2021) Modified on 3/24/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO CHANGE PLAINTIFF'S NAME IN CASE CAPTION FROM CROSSCHX, INC. TO OLIVE AI, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/15/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Order to Change Plaintiff's Name in Case Caption from CROSSCHX, Inc. to OLIVE AI, Inc. by Crosschx, Inc.. (Harrington, Kelley) (Filed on 9/14/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Change of Plaintiff's Name from Crosschx, Inc. to Olive AI, Inc. by Crosschx, Inc. (Harrington, Kelley) (Filed on 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Crosschx, Inc... (Harrington, Kelley) (Filed on 9/8/2020) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT on the filing an action regarding Trademark Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Alpha Health Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/8/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Peterson, Marcus) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Unfair Competition and False Designation of Origin Under 15 U.S.C. 1125; Demand for Jury Trial against Alpha Health, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14848562.). Filed by Crosschx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Peterson, Marcus) (Filed on 8/21/2020) Modified on 8/25/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole Medeiros

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicolas A Jampol

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew P. Bridges

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric J. Ball