This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2021 at 11:23:18 (UTC).

Cross v. ARP-GOLD-64 Bypass at Durkee Road LLC (TV2)

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Cross filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ARP-GOLD-64 Bypass at Durkee Road LLC TV2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are H Bruce Guyton and Thomas A Varlan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Cross

Defendants

Sullivan Painting, Inc.

RI TN 2, LLC. d/b/a Circle K Store

ARP-GOLD-64 Bypass at Durkee Road LLC d/b/a Circle K Store

Sullivan Commercial Painting, Inc.

ARP-GOLD-64 Bypass at Durkee Road LLC doing business as Circle K Store

RI TN 2, LLC doing business as Circle K Store

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew G Coleman

Attorney at Logan-Thompson, P.C.

P.O. Box 191

Cleveland, TN 37364-0191

Defendant Attorney

Joshua A Wolfe

Attorney at McAngus, Goudelock & Courie, LLC (Knoxville)

520 West Summit Hill Drive, Suite 905

Knoxville, TN 37923

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

9 #1

Summons Summons to Sullivan Commercial Painting, Inc.

#9

#8

7 #1

Other amended complaint

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Amended Complaint by ARP-GOLD-64 Bypass at Durkee Road LLC, RI TN 2, LLC. (Wolfe, Joshua) Modified text on 3/31/2021 (AYB). (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Sullivan Commercial Painting, Inc. (AYB) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sullivan Commercial Painting, Inc.., filed by Robert Cross. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Sullivan Commercial Painting, Inc.)(Coleman, Matthew) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff SHALL FILE his Amended Complaint [Doc. 7-1] as his operative pleading in CM/ECF on or before March 18, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/4/21. (ABF) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint by Robert Cross. (Attachments: #1 Other amended complaint)(Coleman, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by RI TN 2, LLC.(Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Corporate Interest by RI TN 2, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Realty Income Corporation for RI TN 2, LLC. (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 02/16/2021. (AMP) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 02/16/2021. (AMP) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 02/16/2021. (AMP) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by ARP-GOLD-64 Bypass at Durkee Road LLC, and RI TN 2, LLC. (AMP) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDistrict Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bradley County Circuit Court, case number V-20-527. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4653790), filed by RI TN 2, LLC. d/b/a Circle K Store. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua A Wolfe