This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2021 at 12:28:42 (UTC).

Cross et al v. Cam Safety, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Cross filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Cam Safety, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Preston Bailey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00012

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Preston Bailey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rancel Jeramy Cross

Rachel Cross

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Profrac Services, LLC

John Doe 2

Cam Safety, LLC

EQT Corporation

John Doe 1

Botha Trucking, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher J. McCabe

Attorney at Bordas & Bordas, PLLC - Pittsburgh

420 Fort Duquesne Blvd., Suite 1800

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Scott S. Blass

Attorney at Bordas & Bordas, PLLC

1358 National Rd

Wheeling, WV 26003

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Nathanial A Kuratomi

Attorney at Jenkins Fenstermaker, PLLC

Po Box 2688

Huntington, WV 25726

Gary Alan Matthews

Attorney at Jenkins Fenstermaker, PLLC

P O Box 2688

Huntington, WV 25726-2688

Jennifer Jo Hicks

Attorney at Babst, Calland, Clements & Zomnir, P.C.

300 Summers Street, Suite 1000

Charleston, WV 25301

Tiffany Marie Arbaugh

Attorney at Babst, Calland, Clements & Zomnir, P.C.

300 Summers Street, Suite 1000

Charleston, WV 25301

James M. Leety

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois

429 Fourth Avenue, Suite 85

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Matthew A. Nelson

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

707 Virginia Street, East, Suite 1400

Charleston, WV 25301

 

Court Documents

22 #1

Exhibit A - Amended Complaint

#22

(#22) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Rancel Jeramy Cross(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(McCabe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Profrac Services LLC by Botha Trucking, LLC.(Leety, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#20

(#20) ORDER TO SUBMIT SCHEDULING ORDER CHECKLIST. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/15/21. (lmm) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#19

(#19) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kuratomi, Nathanial) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Profrac Services, LLC First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Rachel Cross, individually. (Matthews, Gary) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Profrac Services, LLC First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Rancel Cross, individually. (Matthews, Gary) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Profrac Services, LLC First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Rancel Cross, as Natural Guardian of S.C., T.C. and L.C.. (Matthews, Gary) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#11

(#21) ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Profrac Services LLC by Botha Trucking, LLC.(Leety, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Alan Matthews on behalf of Profrac Services, LLC (Matthews, Gary) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - 1/22/21 Email

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Documents from WV Secretary of State

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Documents from WV Secretary of State

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Documents from WV Secretary of State

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Documents from WV Secretary of State

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Wetzel County docket sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Wetzel County, (case number 20-C-55), filed by EQT Corporation, Profrac Services, LLC. Filing Fee $402.00 Receipt #0424-3191192. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wetzel County docket sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Documents from WV Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit 3 - Documents from WV Secretary of State, #4 Exhibit 4 - Documents from WV Secretary of State, #5 Exhibit 5 - Documents from WV Secretary of State, #6 Exhibit 6 - 1/22/21 Email, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Rancel Jeramy Cross(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(McCabe, Christopher) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Profrac Services LLC by Botha Trucking, LLC.(Leety, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER TO SUBMIT SCHEDULING ORDER CHECKLIST. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/15/21. (lmm) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kuratomi, Nathanial) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Profrac Services, LLC First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Rachel Cross, individually. (Matthews, Gary) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Profrac Services, LLC First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Rancel Cross, individually. (Matthews, Gary) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Profrac Services, LLC First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Rancel Cross, as Natural Guardian of S.C., T.C. and L.C.. (Matthews, Gary) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ProFrac Services, LLC's ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of EQT Corporation by Profrac Services, LLC.(Kuratomi, Nathanial) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Botha Trucking, LLC. (Leety, James) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Response to Crossclaim by Botha Trucking, LLC. (Leety, James) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Matthew A. Nelson. (ag) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint and EQT Corporation's Cross-Claim by Botha Trucking, LLC.(Leety, James) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQT Corporation. (Hicks, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION Extending Time for Profrac Services, LLC to Answer Complaint by Profrac Services, LLC. (Matthews, Gary) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint - Amended Answer and Crossclaims of EQT Corporation -, CROSSCLAIM against Botha Trucking, LLC, Cam Safety, LLC, Profrac Services, LLC by EQT Corporation.(Hicks, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 2/26/2021; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/12/2021; Initial Disclosures due by 3/26/2021. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/29/2021. (ag) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint - Answer and Crossclaims of EQT Corporation -, CROSSCLAIM against Botha Trucking, LLC, Cam Safety, LLC, Profrac Services, LLC by EQT Corporation.(Hicks, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION Extending Time for Profrac Services, LLC to Answer Complaint by Profrac Services, LLC. (Kuratomi, Nathanial) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Alan Matthews on behalf of Profrac Services, LLC (Matthews, Gary) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Wetzel County, (case number 20-C-55), filed by EQT Corporation, Profrac Services, LLC. Filing Fee $402.00 Receipt #0424-3191192. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wetzel County docket sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Documents from WV Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit 3 - Documents from WV Secretary of State, #4 Exhibit 4 - Documents from WV Secretary of State, #5 Exhibit 5 - Documents from WV Secretary of State, #6 Exhibit 6 - 1/22/21 Email, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Profrac Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EQT Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary A. Matthews

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tiffany Marie Arbaugh