This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:47:03 (UTC).

Crosby v. St. Francis Medical Center

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Crosby filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against St Francis Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Kayla D McClusky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00155

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Kayla D McClusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

jaeda Goodwin Crosby

Defendants

St. Francis Medical Center

St Francis Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James L Carroll

Attorney at Mixon Carroll & Frazier

P O Drawer 1619

Columbia, LA 71418

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jaeda Goodwin Crosby with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4964253) filed by Jaeda Goodwin Crosby. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James L Carroll added to party Jaeda Goodwin Crosby(pty:pla))(aty,Carroll, James) (Attachment 1 replaced with unfillable pdf and to indicate deficient on 1/20/2022) (Miletello, A). Modified on 1/20/2022 to remove deficiency, see #3 Civil Cover Sheet (Miletello, A). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Deficiency to James L Carroll on behalf of Jaeda Goodwin Crosby regarding #1 Complaint. Reason: A blank Civil Cover Sheet was submitted with the complaint. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jaeda Goodwin Crosby. (aty,Carroll, James) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to St Francis Medical Center. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jaeda Goodwin Crosby. St Francis Medical Center waiver sent on 2/3/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (aty,Carroll, James) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jaeda Goodwin Crosby. St Francis Medical Center waiver sent on 2/3/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (aty,Carroll, James) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to St Francis Medical Center. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jaeda Goodwin Crosby. (aty,Carroll, James) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Deficiency to James L Carroll on behalf of Jaeda Goodwin Crosby regarding #1 Complaint. Reason: A blank Civil Cover Sheet was submitted with the complaint. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jaeda Goodwin Crosby with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4964253) filed by Jaeda Goodwin Crosby. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James L Carroll added to party Jaeda Goodwin Crosby(pty:pla))(aty,Carroll, James) (Attachment 1 replaced with unfillable pdf and to indicate deficient on 1/20/2022) (Miletello, A). Modified on 1/20/2022 to remove deficiency, see #3 Civil Cover Sheet (Miletello, A). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James L Carroll