This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2020 at 07:07:07 (UTC).

Cropsey v. Saul

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Cropsey filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Hixson and Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-06034

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Thomas S. Hixson

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark O Cropsey

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather Michele Freinkel

Attorney at Homeless Action Center

2601 San Pablo Ave.

Oakland, CA 94612

Paul Kim

Attorney at Homeless Action Center

3126 Shattuck Avenue

Berkeley, CA 94705

Defendant Attorney

Patrick William Snyder

Attorney at Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#13

RESTRICTED

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#12

(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 09/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER FOR PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER RE STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/11/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Kim (Kim, Paul) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 09/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark O Cropsey.. (Freinkel, Heather) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER FOR PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER RE STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/11/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/10/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Snyder, Patrick) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketSummons and waiver emailed to SSA. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/10/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark O Cropsey. (Freinkel, Heather) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed byMark O Cropsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freinkel, Heather) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less