This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2021 at 07:11:40 (UTC).

CROPPER et al v. STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 CROPPER filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against STANLEY BLACK DECKER, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02201

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHANNON CROPPER

KERRILYNN CROPPER

SHANNON M. CROPPER

Defendants and Cross Defendants

UNIFIED DOOR AND HARDWARE GROUP, LLC

JOHN DOES #1-5

TRU-FIT FRAME & DOOR CORP.

DORMAKABA USA, INC. doing business as BEST doing business as STANLEY doing business as STANLEY COMMERCIAL HARDWARE doing business as BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC.

TAIWAN FU HSING INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. doing business as BEST doing business as STANLEY doing business as STANLEY COMMERCIAL HARDWARE

FU HSING AMERICAS INC. doing business as BEST doing business as STANLEY doing business as STANLEY COMMERCIAL HARDWARE

BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as BEST doing business as STANLEY doing business as STANLEY COMMERCIAL HARDWARE

STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC. doing business as STANLEY SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS doing business as BEST doing business as STANLEY doing business as STANLEY COMMERCIAL HARDWARE

STANLEY SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC. doing business as BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS doing business as BEST doing business as STANLEY doing business as STANLEY COMMERCIAL HARDWARE

BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS doing business as BEST doing business as STANLEY doing business as STANLEY COMMERCIAL HARDWARE

JOHN DOES 1-5

BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC.

BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS

DORMAKABA USA, INC.

STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC.

Cross Claimants

TAIWAN FU HSING INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.

FU HSING AMERICAS INC.

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEONARD G. VILLARI

Attorney at VILLARI LENTZ & LYNAM, LLC

100 North 20Th Street, Suite 302

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ROBERTO K. PAGLIONE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TERKOWITZ & HERMESMANN

10,000 Lincoln Drive East, Suite 201

Marlton, NJ 08053

ALEXANDRA SKARKA

Attorney at Wilson Elser, LLP

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market S

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JONATHAN DRYER

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market St Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

HENRY J. NOYE

Attorney at BUNKER & RAY

436 Walnut Street

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

HENRY J. NOYE

Attorney at BUNKER & RAY

436 Walnut Street

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) STIPULATION re #12 Request for Default, #14 Request for Default, #13 Request for Default, Clerk's Entry of Default, Default Entered by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER. (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERTO K. PAGLIONE on behalf of TRU-FIT FRAME & DOOR CORP., UNIFIED DOOR AND HARDWARE GROUP, LLC (PAGLIONE, ROBERTO) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TIME FOR BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS, DORMAKABA USA, INC TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 7/28/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/29/21. 6/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney), To Extend Time to Answer by BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS, DORMAKABA USA, INC.. (SKARKA, ALEXANDRA) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDRA SKARKA on behalf of BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS, DORMAKABA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(SKARKA, ALEXANDRA) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN DRYER on behalf of BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS, DORMAKABA USA, INC. with COS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service COS for EOA for JD and AES)(DRYER, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#14

(#14) Request for Default CORRECTED TO REFLECT PROPER DEFENDANT KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER against UNIFIED DOOR AND HARDWARE GROUP, LLC. (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#13

(#21) STIPULATION re #12 Request for Default, #14 Request for Default, #13 Request for Default, Clerk's Entry of Default, Default Entered by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER. (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#12

(#21) STIPULATION re #12 Request for Default, #14 Request for Default, #13 Request for Default, Clerk's Entry of Default, Default Entered by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER. (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Attorney), upon Defendant, Taiwan Fu Hsing Industrial Co., LTD. d/b/a Stanley and Stanley Commercial Hardware (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Attorney), upon Defendant, Fu Hsing Americas, Inc. d/b/a Best, Stanely and Stanley Commercial Hardware (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Attorney), upon Defendant, Unified Door and Hardware Group, LLC (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Attorney), upon Defendant, Tru-Fit Frame & Door Corp. (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/24/21. 5/24/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form Cropper Track Designation

1 #2

Designation Form Cropper Designation

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Cropper Cover Sheet

#1

(#18) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney), To Extend Time to Answer by BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS, DORMAKABA USA, INC.. (SKARKA, ALEXANDRA) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION re #12 Request for Default, #14 Request for Default, #13 Request for Default, Clerk's Entry of Default, Default Entered by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER. (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERTO K. PAGLIONE on behalf of TRU-FIT FRAME & DOOR CORP., UNIFIED DOOR AND HARDWARE GROUP, LLC (PAGLIONE, ROBERTO) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TIME FOR BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS, DORMAKABA USA, INC TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 7/28/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/29/21. 6/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney), To Extend Time to Answer by BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS, DORMAKABA USA, INC.. (SKARKA, ALEXANDRA) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDRA SKARKA on behalf of BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS, DORMAKABA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(SKARKA, ALEXANDRA) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN DRYER on behalf of BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS, DORMAKABA USA, INC. with COS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service COS for EOA for JD and AES)(DRYER, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS, DORMAKABA USA, INC., JOHN DOES 1-5, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC., STANLEY SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC., TRU-FIT FRAME & DOOR CORP., UNIFIED DOOR AND HARDWARE GROUP, LLC by TAIWAN FU HSING INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD., FU HSING AMERICAS INC..(NOYE, HENRY) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDefault Entered (rf, ) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT BY TRU-FIT FRAME & DOOR CORP., UNIFIED DOOR AND HARDWARE GROUP, LLC FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (rf, ) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Request for Default CORRECTED TO REFLECT PROPER DEFENDANT KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER against UNIFIED DOOR AND HARDWARE GROUP, LLC. (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Attorney), upon Defendant, Best Access Systems d/b/a Best, Stanley and Stanley Commercial Hardware (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Attorney), upon Defendant, Dormakaba USA, Inc.d/b/a Best Access Solutions, Inc., Best, Stanley and Stanley Commercia Hardware (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Attorney), upon Defendant, Taiwan Fu Hsing Industrial Co., LTD. d/b/a Stanley and Stanley Commercial Hardware (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Attorney), upon Defendant, Fu Hsing Americas, Inc. d/b/a Best, Stanely and Stanley Commercial Hardware (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Attorney), upon Defendant, Unified Door and Hardware Group, LLC (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Attorney), upon Defendant, Tru-Fit Frame & Door Corp. (VILLARI, LEONARD) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/24/21. 5/24/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to BEST ACCESS SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST ACCESS SYSTEMS, DORMAKABA USA, INC., FU HSING AMERICAS INC., STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC., STANLEY SECURITY SOLUTIONS, INC., TAIWAN FU HSING INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD., TRU-FIT FRAME & DOOR CORP., UNIFIED DOOR AND HARDWARE GROUP, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/17/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER. (md, ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15122565.), filed by KERRILYNN CROPPER, SHANNON M. CROPPER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cropper Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Cropper Designation, #3 Case Management Track Form Cropper Track Designation)(VILLARI, LEONARD) Modified on 5/17/2021 (md, ). (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stanley Security Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DORMA USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC. A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION is a litigant