This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2023 at 07:20:36 (UTC).

Crooks v. AW Chesterton Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 Crooks filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AW Chesterton Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06089

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Crooks

Defendants

AW Chesterton Company

AO Smith Corporation

ABB Inc

AFC-Holcroft, LLC

Air & Liquid Systems, Inc., Successor by Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.

Ajax Magnethermic Corporation

Armstrong International, Inc.

Armstrong Pumps, Inc.

Aurora Pump Company

Baker Hughes, Incorporated

Blackmer Pump Company

Bryan Steam Corporation

Burnham, LLC

BW/IP Inc

Carrier Corporation

Copes-Vulcan, Inc.

Crane Company

Dana Companies, LLC.

DAP, Inc.

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Megan Fahey Monty

Attorney at Cooney & Conway

120 N. Lasalle, Ste. 30

Chicago, IL 60602

Other Attorneys

Steven Alan Hart

Attorney at Hart McLaughlin & Eldridge, LLC

22 W. Washington St., Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) MAILED REMAND with certified copy of order dated 11/09/2022 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (rc, ) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corp.'s withdrawal of its notice of removal and its supplemental statement filed on 11/7/2022 the Clerk is directed to remand this case forthwith to the Circuit Court of Cook County. Plaintiff's motion to remand #11 is terminated as moot. The telephonic hearing set for 11/10/2022 is vacated. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

11 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Defendant Foster Wheeler

11 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Defendant Foster Wheeler

11 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Defendant Foster Wheeler

11 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Defendant Foster Wheeler

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) NOTICE by David Crooks of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Removal (Monty, Megan) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Crooks by Megan Fahey Monty and Lawrence R. Weisler (Monty, Megan) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#8

(#8) Supplemental Statement Following the Court's Minute Order of Saturday, November 5th, 2022 STATEMENT by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Hart, Steven) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corp. removed this case to federal court based on the "federal officer" removal statute, 28 USC 1442(a)(1), alleging that it has a federal defense to plaintiff's claims. The removal of the case to federal court was, of course, accomplished by filing the notice of removal. Then, the next day, Foster Wheeler filed a document asking to "withdraw" its removal of the case. This document provided no explanation. The Court wants one and also wants to ascertain the likelihood that one or more of the six-dozen-plus defendants remaining in the case will hereafter remove the case again. The case is set for a telephonic hearing on 11/10/2022 at 9:45 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Foster Wheeler's attorney is directed to immediately provide notice of this order to plaintiff's attorney (who will not receive this notice via CM/ECF because of the recent removal of the case) and is also directed to participate in the hearing. Other defense counsel may also participate if they wish. (mk) (Entered: 11/05/2022)

#6

(#6) MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation to withdraw Motion to Withdraw Petition of Removal (Hart, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#4

(#4) F.R.C.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Hart, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation by Steven Alan Hart (Hart, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hart, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (daj, ) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MAILED REMAND with certified copy of order dated 11/09/2022 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (rc, ) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corp.'s withdrawal of its notice of removal and its supplemental statement filed on 11/7/2022 the Clerk is directed to remand this case forthwith to the Circuit Court of Cook County. Plaintiff's motion to remand #11 is terminated as moot. The telephonic hearing set for 11/10/2022 is vacated. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Plaintiff David Crooks to remand Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Removal)(Monty, Megan) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by David Crooks of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Removal (Monty, Megan) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Crooks by Megan Fahey Monty and Lawrence R. Weisler (Monty, Megan) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Supplemental Statement Following the Court's Minute Order of Saturday, November 5th, 2022 STATEMENT by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Hart, Steven) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corp. removed this case to federal court based on the "federal officer" removal statute, 28 USC 1442(a)(1), alleging that it has a federal defense to plaintiff's claims. The removal of the case to federal court was, of course, accomplished by filing the notice of removal. Then, the next day, Foster Wheeler filed a document asking to "withdraw" its removal of the case. This document provided no explanation. The Court wants one and also wants to ascertain the likelihood that one or more of the six-dozen-plus defendants remaining in the case will hereafter remove the case again. The case is set for a telephonic hearing on 11/10/2022 at 9:45 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Foster Wheeler's attorney is directed to immediately provide notice of this order to plaintiff's attorney (who will not receive this notice via CM/ECF because of the recent removal of the case) and is also directed to participate in the hearing. Other defense counsel may also participate if they wish. (mk) (Entered: 11/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation to withdraw Motion to Withdraw Petition of Removal (Hart, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, ) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) F.R.C.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Hart, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation by Steven Alan Hart (Hart, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hart, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2022L008425) filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20010951. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hart, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bryan Steam LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION is a litigant