This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/15/2021 at 08:58:00 (UTC).

Cromartie v. Recovery Solutions Group LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 Cromartie filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Recovery Solutions Group LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00145

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly Cromartie

Defendants

Recovery Solutions Group LLC

All Dry USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Koury L. Hicks

Attorney at Law Offices of John T. Orcutt, P.C.

1738 Hillandale Road, Suite D

Durham, NC 27705

Craig M. Shapiro

Attorney at Law Offices of John T. Orcutt, P.C.

1738 Hillandale Road, Suite D

Durham, NC 27705

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Reissued as to Recovery Solutions Group LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice filed by Kelly Cromartie (Proposed Summons). (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Dry USA, LLC, Recovery Solutions Group LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Koury L. Hicks on behalf of Kelly Cromartie. (Hicks, Koury) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Kelly Cromartie (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Craig M. Shapiro on behalf of Kelly Cromartie. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Dry USA, LLC, Recovery Solutions Group LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6188529.), filed by Kelly Cromartie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Recovery Solutions Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where All Dry Usa is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Koury L. Hicks

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig M. Shapiro