This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2020 at 14:57:33 (UTC).

Crockford et al v. First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Crockford filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against First American Property Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald B. Leighton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05511

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald B. Leighton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aimee Crockford

Kelvin Crockford

Defendants

First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Lawrence Morgan

John Does I-III

Crawford & Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Candler Smart

Attorney at RUIZ & SMART PLAINTIFF LITIGATION PLLC

95 S Jackson St, Ste 100

Seattle, WA 98104

Isaac Ruiz

Attorney at RUIZ & SMART PLAINTIFF LITIGATION PLLC

95 S Jackson St, Ste 100

Seattle, WA 98104

McKean J Evans

Attorney at RUIZ & SMART PLAINTIFF LITIGATION PLLC

95 S Jackson St, Ste 100

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorneys

Rory W Leid, III

Attorney at COLE WATHEN LEID HALL PC

1505 Westlake Ave N Ste 700

Seattle, WA 98109

Sonia Martin

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP (SF)

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Paul Kakuske

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

601 S Figueroa St, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Christopher Joseph Roslaniec

Attorney at COLE WATHEN LEID HALL PC

1505 Westlake Ave N Ste 700

Seattle, WA 98109

Joel D Siegel

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

601 S Figueroa St, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jennifer Grandoff Cooper

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON

3414 Peachtree Rd Ne Ste 1500

Atlanta, GA 30326

Matthew S Adams

Attorney at FORSBERG & UMLAUF (SEA)

901 5Th Ave, Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98164-1039

Carl Edward Forsberg

Attorney at FORSBERG & UMLAUF (SEA)

901 5Th Ave, Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98164-1039

James Edward Horne

Attorney at FORSBERG & UMLAUF (SEA)

901 5Th Ave, Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98164-1039

Matthew James Leonard

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON

3414 Peachtree Rd Ne Ste 1500

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief; Demand for Jury Trial by First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Roslaniec, Christopher) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney William Candler Smart. Filed by Plaintiffs Kelvin Crockford, Aimee Crockford. (Smart, William) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#25

(#25) ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint by Crawford & Company, Lawrence Morgan.(Forsberg, Carl) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#24

(#24) DECLARATION In Support of Federal Jurisdiction of Patricia Monroe re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendant First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Siegel, Joel) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#19

(#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crawford & Company (Forsberg, Carl) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#18

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 20-05419, by Defendant First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Roslaniec, Christopher) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#8

(#8) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Kelvin Crockford, Aimee Crockford (Smart, William) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#3

(#6) ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sonia Martin for First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint Complaint - Exhibit A

#1

(#24) DECLARATION In Support of Federal Jurisdiction of Patricia Monroe re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendant First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Siegel, Joel) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' #23 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Roslaniec, Christopher) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief; Demand for Jury Trial by First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Roslaniec, Christopher) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney William Candler Smart. Filed by Plaintiffs Kelvin Crockford, Aimee Crockford. (Smart, William) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint by Crawford & Company, Lawrence Morgan.(Forsberg, Carl) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) DECLARATION In Support of Federal Jurisdiction of Patricia Monroe re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendant First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Siegel, Joel) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Kelvin Crockford, Aimee Crockford.(Smart, William) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/3/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/10/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings as related to 3:20-cv-05419-RBL. Judge Benjamin H. Settle no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (SP) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crawford & Company (Forsberg, Carl) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketJudge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KB) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 20-05419, by Defendant First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Roslaniec, Christopher) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Kelvin Crockford, Aimee Crockford (Smart, William) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul Kakuske for First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sonia Martin for First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joel D Siegel for First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul M. Kakuske FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6372745 (Roslaniec, Christopher) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sonia R. Martin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6372732 (Roslaniec, Christopher) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joel D. Siegel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6372712 (Roslaniec, Christopher) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 20-2-05999-0; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6372500) Attorney Christopher Joseph Roslaniec added to party First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Complaint - Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibits B-I, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Roslaniec, Christopher) Modified on 6/2/2020 to remove duplicative language (KB). (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less