This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2020 at 08:45:28 (UTC).

Crocker v. Jamison et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Crocker filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Jamison. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Janet C. Hall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01433

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet C. Hall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn Crocker

Cheshire, CT 06410

Defendants

Cynthia

Vincourt Fantavenere

Peter Jamison

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Peter Jamison waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/26/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#9

(#9) Standing Order re: Initial Discovery Disclosures Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/21/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. The Fourteenth Amendment due process claim, any claim for damages against the defendants in their official capacities, and any possible Eighth Amendment claim for harassment are DISMISSED pursuant to section 1915A(b)(1) and (2) of title 28 of the U.S. Code. The First Amendment retaliation claim is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to section 1915A(b)(1). Crocker may file an Amended Complaint reasserting his retaliation claim if he can allege facts addressing the deficiencies in the retaliation claim identified in this Order. The case will proceed on the Fourteenth Amendment equal protection claim against Dr. Jamison. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/21/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 09/23/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 09/23/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 09/23/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shawn Crocker. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#1

(#1) PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Cynthia, Peter Jamison, Vincourt Fantavenere, filed by Shawn Crocker.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Peter Jamison waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/26/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dr. Peter Jamison on 10/27/2020. Waiver of Service due by 12/1/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Standing Order re: Initial Discovery Disclosures Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/21/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. The Fourteenth Amendment due process claim, any claim for damages against the defendants in their official capacities, and any possible Eighth Amendment claim for harassment are DISMISSED pursuant to section 1915A(b)(1) and (2) of title 28 of the U.S. Code. The First Amendment retaliation claim is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to section 1915A(b)(1). Crocker may file an Amended Complaint reasserting his retaliation claim if he can allege facts addressing the deficiencies in the retaliation claim identified in this Order. The case will proceed on the Fourteenth Amendment equal protection claim against Dr. Jamison. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/21/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel on 9/29/20. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 09/23/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 09/23/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 09/23/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Shawn Crocker. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shawn Crocker. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Cynthia, Peter Jamison, Vincourt Fantavenere, filed by Shawn Crocker.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less