This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2022 at 07:04:40 (UTC).

Crocker v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/06/2021 Crocker filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00461

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janice Crocker

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fatima Abuzerr

Attorney at Moll Law Group

22 W. Washington, 15Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

John R. Szymankiewicz

Attorney at Matheson Law Office PLLC

16 W. Martin Street, #501

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6308006.), filed by Janice Crocker. (Szymankiewicz, John) (Entered: 11/06/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice filed by Janice Crocker regarding #1 Complaint Civil Coversheet. (Szymankiewicz, John) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Fatima Abuzerr on behalf of Janice Crocker. (Abuzerr, Fatima) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Janice Crocker (Abuzerr, Fatima) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice filed by Janice Crocker regarding #1 Complaint Proposed Summons for Boston Scientific Corporation. (Abuzerr, Fatima) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Boston Scientific Corporation. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Boston Scientific Corporation. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice filed by Janice Crocker regarding #1 Complaint Proposed Summons for Boston Scientific Corporation. (Abuzerr, Fatima) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Janice Crocker (Abuzerr, Fatima) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Fatima Abuzerr on behalf of Janice Crocker. (Abuzerr, Fatima) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice filed by Janice Crocker regarding #1 Complaint Civil Coversheet. (Szymankiewicz, John) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Janice Crocker. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6308006.), filed by Janice Crocker. (Szymankiewicz, John) (Entered: 11/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant