This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2021 at 09:28:24 (UTC).

Crispin v. Peiri et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Crispin filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Peiri. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kari A. Dooley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00475

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kari A. Dooley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jossean Crispin

Cheshire, CT 06410

Defendants

Richard Piery

Jane Doe

Kocienda

Patel

John Doe

Counselor Green

Callahann

Barbara K.

Cinthia Nadeau

Sara Torres

Andrea Reischerl

Hannah

Craig Burn

Dave Miaga

Rollin Cook

Nick Rodriguez

Egan

Jackson

Peiry

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re: #15 Amended Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#15

(#15) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL amending #14 Notice of Appeal, #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, by Jossean Crispin. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, by Jossean Crispin. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#12

(#12) (SECOND) ADDENDUM re #9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, filed by Jossean Crispin. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Recorded Emergency Phone Conference on Record by Jossean Crispin. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER denying #9 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/11/2021. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, by Jossean Crispin. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. All further proceedings in the matter shall be held in abeyance until June 3, 2021 pending Crispin's delivery of the filing fee in the amount of $402.00 (money order or bank check made payable to the Clerk of Court) to the Clerks Office, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, Connecticut, 06604. Failure to tender the filing fee within thirty days of this order will result in the dismissal of this action. See attached Order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/3/2021. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE to the Court (Exhibit Filings) by Jossean Crispin (Payton, R.) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 04/5/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 04/5/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 04/5/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jossean Crispin. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#1

(#1) PRISCS - COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jossean Crispin.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re: #15 Amended Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE TO PRISSCAN INCARCERATED APPELLANT : Unless otherwise directed, all further filings required to be filed at the Court of Appeals must be made with the Court of Appeals in accordance with their Rules. The Prisoner E-filing system may not be used to file documents with the Court of Appeals. Signed by Clerk on 5/17/21.(Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL amending #14 Notice of Appeal, #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, by Jossean Crispin. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, by Jossean Crispin. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER denying #11 Motion for Conference. No conference with respect to the Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is warranted. Regardless the source of the funds in the inmate account, the funds were available to the Plaintiff prior to his commencement of this action. To the extent the Plaintiff continues to seek reconsideration on this issue, his request is denied. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/13/21. (Dooley, Kari) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) (SECOND) ADDENDUM re #9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, filed by Jossean Crispin. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Recorded Emergency Phone Conference on Record by Jossean Crispin. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER denying #9 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/11/2021. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, by Jossean Crispin. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. All further proceedings in the matter shall be held in abeyance until June 3, 2021 pending Crispin's delivery of the filing fee in the amount of $402.00 (money order or bank check made payable to the Clerk of Court) to the Clerks Office, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, Connecticut, 06604. Failure to tender the filing fee within thirty days of this order will result in the dismissal of this action. See attached Order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/3/2021. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE to the Court (Exhibit Filings) by Jossean Crispin (Payton, R.) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 04/5/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 04/5/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 04/5/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jossean Crispin. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jossean Crispin. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISCS - COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jossean Crispin.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hannah is a litigant

Latest cases where Egan is a litigant

Latest cases where Patel is a litigant

Latest cases where JACKSON is a litigant