This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 08:45:56 (UTC).

Crimson Cattle Company, L.L.C. v. Amentum Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Crimson Cattle Company, L L C filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Amentum Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen Michael Doyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00011

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen Michael Doyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crimson Cattle Company, L.L.C.

Defendant

Amentum Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Gerald Palfery Gillespy

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

420 N 20Th St - Ste 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Christopher Eugene Sanspree

Attorney at Sanspree Law Firm PC

603 Martha Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Consent to Dismissal #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amentum Services, Inc.. (Gillespy, Gerald) Modified on 2/24/2022 to clarify text as reflected in pleading (am, ). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 2/28/2022, Defendant shall file a response to the #7 Motion, indicating whether it opposes the Motion, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/23/2022. (am, ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Crimson Cattle Company, L.L.C.. (Sanspree, Christopher) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER: It is ORDERED that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/25/2022, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/28/2022. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER: It is ORDERED that any party wishing to provide such consent must complete the form and submit it to the Clerk by 2/25/2022; Any party wishing to submit the reassignment form must mail it to the above address by 2/25/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/28/2022. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Amentum Services, Inc..(Gillespy, Gerald) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Amentum Services & Inc., Crimson Cattle Company, L.L.C. (am, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#2

(#2) Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amentum Services, Inc. (am, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

1 #8

Receipt

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Notice of Filing to State Court

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Declaration

1 #2

Exhibit 1-State Court Record

1 #1

State Court Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent to Dismissal #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amentum Services, Inc.. (Gillespy, Gerald) Modified on 2/24/2022 to clarify text as reflected in pleading (am, ). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 2/28/2022, Defendant shall file a response to the #7 Motion, indicating whether it opposes the Motion, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/23/2022. (am, ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Crimson Cattle Company, L.L.C.. (Sanspree, Christopher) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: It is ORDERED that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/25/2022, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/28/2022. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: It is ORDERED that any party wishing to provide such consent must complete the form and submit it to the Clerk by 2/25/2022; Any party wishing to submit the reassignment form must mail it to the above address by 2/25/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/28/2022. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Amentum Services, Inc..(Gillespy, Gerald) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Amentum Services & Inc., Crimson Cattle Company, L.L.C. (am, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amentum Services, Inc. (am, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Filing to State Court of Notice of Removal by Amentum Services, Inc. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Crimson Cattle Company, L.L.C. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT against Amentum Services, Inc., filed by Crimson Cattle Company, L.L.C.. (NO PDF - See doc #1 )(am, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amentum Services, Inc. from Circuit Court of Geneva Alabama, case number 34-CV-2021-900078.00. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 4602065619) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-State Court Record, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Notice of Filing to State Court, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Receipt)(am, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amentum Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Eugene Sanspree

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerald P Gillespy