Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/07/2020 at 15:39:14 (UTC).

Crimi-Spangler v. Zimmer Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 Crimi-Spangler filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Zimmer Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy J. Koppe and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01011

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cynthia L Crimi-Spangler

Defendants

Zimmer Holdings, Inc.

Zimmer, Inc.

In Re

ZIMMER DUROM HIP CUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOUGLASS ALAN KREIS

Attorney at Counsel Not Admitted to USDC - NJ Bar

17 East Main Street, Suitee 200

Pensacola, FL 32502

Peter C Wetherall

Attorney at Wetherall Group, Ltd.

9345 W. Sunset Road, Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Joseph A. Osborne

Attorney at Babbitt, Johnson, Osborne & Le Clainche, P.A.

1641 Worthington Rd, Suite 100

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Defendant Attorneys

Jean P. Patterson

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

Four Gateway Centert, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

EDWARD J. FANNING, JR.

Attorney at MCCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP

Four Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, Po Box 652

Newark, NJ 07101-0652

Andrew L. Campbell

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

300 N. Meridian St. Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Stephanie N Russo

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP - Ind/IN/300/2700

300 N Meridian St Ste 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

LeAnn Sanders

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Margaret Courtney Christopher

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway #200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER Granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Stephanie N Russo and approving Designation of Local Counsel LeAnn Sanders. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/27/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Peter C Wetherall on behalf of Plaintiff Cynthia L Crimi-Spangler. (Wetherall, Peter) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew L. Campbell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel LeAnn Sanders (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6095791) by Defendants Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie N. Russo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel LeAnn Sanders (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6094968) by Defendants Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#13

(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LeAnn Sanders on behalf of Defendants Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/8/2020. This action was received on* 6/8/20* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* District of New Jersey* and assigned case number 2:20-cv-01011-GMN-NJK. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2020. Verified Petition due by 7/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

(#7) NOTICE by All Defendants Joint Notice of Unsettled Case (RUSSO, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JEAN PAIGE PATTERSON on behalf of ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC., ZIMMER, INC. (PATTERSON, JEAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#4

(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/13/16. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/23/10. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC., ZIMMER, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by CYNTHIA L. CRIMI-SPANGLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KREIS, DOUGLASS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 08/27/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER Granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Andrew L Campbell and approving Designation of Local Counsel LeAnn Sanders. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/27/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER Granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Stephanie N Russo and approving Designation of Local Counsel LeAnn Sanders. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/27/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Peter C Wetherall on behalf of Plaintiff Cynthia L Crimi-Spangler. (Wetherall, Peter) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew L. Campbell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel LeAnn Sanders (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6095791) by Defendants Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie N. Russo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel LeAnn Sanders (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6094968) by Defendants Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Joseph A. Osborne, Douglas Alan Kreis, Andrew L Campbell, Edward J. Fanning, Jr., Jean P. Patterson, Stephanie N Russo to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/22/2020. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LeAnn Sanders on behalf of Defendants Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/8/2020. This action was received on* 6/8/20* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* District of New Jersey* and assigned case number 2:20-cv-01011-GMN-NJK. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2020. Verified Petition due by 7/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by All Defendants Joint Notice of Unsettled Case (RUSSO, STEPHANIE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion no longer assigned to the case. (as, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JEAN PAIGE PATTERSON on behalf of ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC., ZIMMER, INC. (PATTERSON, JEAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. FANNING, JR on behalf of ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC., ZIMMER, INC. (FANNING, EDWARD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/13/16. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/23/10. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 8/27/18, for MDL 2158 ZIMMER DUROM HIP CUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC., ZIMMER, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketJudge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by CYNTHIA L. CRIMI-SPANGLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KREIS, DOUGLASS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZIMMER DUROM CUP HIP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Zimmer Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Zimmer Holdings Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter C Wetherall