This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2022 at 06:03:05 (UTC).

CRIMANS v. HEALTH & HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 CRIMANS filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against HEALTH HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02906

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stacey Crimans

Defendant

Health & Hospital Corporation of Marion County d/b/a Eskenazi Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stuart A. Davidson

Attorney at ROBBINS GELLER RUDMAN & DOWD LLP

120 E. Palmetto Park Rd., Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Bradley Beall

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

120 E. Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Dorothy Antullis

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

120 East Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Paolo Chagas Meireles

Attorney at Shavitz Law Group, P.A.

951 Yamato Rd, Suite 285

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendant Attorneys

Paul G Karlsgodt

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Philip R. Zimmerly

Attorney at BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS, LLP (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Michelle R. Gomez

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1801 California Street, Ste 4400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) ORDER VACATING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Comes now the Court, sua sponte, and VACATES the TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE currently set in this matter on February 28, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/23/2022.(AAS) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#33

(#33) CLOSED DISMISSED (Marginal Notation) - The Court acknowledges the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice, dkt. #30 . Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/22/2022. (DWH) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff STACEY CRIMANS. (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#29

(#29) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/14/2022. Parties were represented by counsel. The Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 2/28/2022 at 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (LES) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

28 #2

[Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay Case

28 #1

Exhibit A

28 #28

Main Document

27 #3

Exhibit B

27 #1

Defendant's Brief in Support of Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff&

8 #8

Main Document

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by STACEY CRIMANS. HEALTH & HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY served on 11/29/2021. (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#5

(#5) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A. Davidson on behalf of Plaintiff STACEY CRIMANS. (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to HEALTH & HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (NLR) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NLR) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER VACATING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Comes now the Court, sua sponte, and VACATES the TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE currently set in this matter on February 28, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/23/2022.(AAS) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) CLOSED DISMISSED (Marginal Notation) - The Court acknowledges the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice, dkt. #30 . Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/22/2022. (DWH) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff STACEY CRIMANS. (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/14/2022. Parties were represented by counsel. The Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 2/28/2022 at 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (LES) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendant HEALTH & HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay Case)(Gomez, Michelle) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant HEALTH & HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Brief in Support of Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Gomez, Michelle) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff STACEY CRIMANS . (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Paul E Karlsgodt for HEALTH & HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY added. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that Paul G. Karlsgodt must complete the process and procedure for pro hac vice admission in PACER, which includes requesting access to the court's Electronic Case Filing System (ECF) by February 4, 2022, in accordance with Local Rule 83-6(b). Failure to comply could result in the revocation of admission pro hac vice. Copy to Counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/21/2022. (AAS) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #20 Motion for Entry of Schedule on Defendant's Anticipated Rule 12(b) Motion to Dismiss - Defendant's Response to the Complaint is due on or before February 8, 2022; Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss or Amended Complaint is due on or before March 17, 2022; and Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (if necessary) is due on or before March 31, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/19/2022.(JRB) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul G. Karlsgodt to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-6930817), filed by Defendant HEALTH & HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Paul G. Karlsgodt, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zimmerly, Philip) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Paolo Chagas Meireles for STACEY CRIMANS added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/10/2021. (AAS) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Attorney(s) Bradley M. Beall to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff STACEY CRIMANS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beall, Bradley) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Dorothy P. Antullis to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff STACEY CRIMANS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Antullis, Dorothy) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Attorney(s) Paolo C. Meireles to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-6877171), filed by Plaintiff STACEY CRIMANS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meireles, Paolo) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by STACEY CRIMANS. HEALTH & HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY served on 11/29/2021. (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A. Davidson on behalf of Plaintiff STACEY CRIMANS. (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to HEALTH & HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (NLR) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NLR) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Health & Hospital Corporation of Marion County d/b/a Eskenazi Health, filed by Stacey Crimans. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6855309) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A)(Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip R. Zimmerly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle R. Gomez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul G Karlsgodt