This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2022 at 07:53:10 (UTC).

Cright v. Navigator International, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Cright filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Navigator International, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Austin Huffaker, Jr and Stephen Michael Doyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00807

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Austin Huffaker, Jr

Referral Judge

Stephen Michael Doyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seymour Cright, III

Defendants

Navigator International, LLC

M1 Support Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea Schlotterbeck Hatchcock

Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Lea Lockwood

Richard J.R. Raleigh, Jr.

Yvonne Norris Maddalena

 

Court Documents

21 #3

Exhibit C

21 #2

Exhibit B

21 #1

Exhibit A

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (am, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER: DIRECTING that any party wishing to provide such consent must complete the form and submit it to the Clerk of Court by 2/4/2022, as further set out in Order; Any party wishing to submit the reassignment form must mail it to the above address by 2/4/2022, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/14/2022. (am, ) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#17

(#17) (VACATED PURSUANT TO THE 19 ORDER) ORDER: DIRECTING that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable, but no later than 2/4/2022, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/14/2022. (am, ) Modified on 1/18/2022 (am, ). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

16 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Laura Marr

16 #16

Main Document

2 #1

Standing Order & Sample

2 #2

Main Document

1 #6

Receipt

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Seymour Cright, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McPhillips, Julian) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (am, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred to Judge Doyle: #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of the #16 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant M1 Support Services, it is ORDERED that, on or before 2/1/2022, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, if any there be, why the Motion should not be granted; Defendant M1 may reply on or before 2/15/2022; Further, it is ORDERED that the undersigneds previous order requiring the parties to submit their Rule 26(f) report is VACATED pending the disposition of Defendant M1's #16 Motion; The parties are reminded that consent forms remain due 2/4/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/18/2022. (NO PDF attached to this entry)(am, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: DIRECTING that any party wishing to provide such consent must complete the form and submit it to the Clerk of Court by 2/4/2022, as further set out in Order; Any party wishing to submit the reassignment form must mail it to the above address by 2/4/2022, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/14/2022. (am, ) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) (VACATED PURSUANT TO THE 19 ORDER) ORDER: DIRECTING that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable, but no later than 2/4/2022, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/14/2022. (am, ) Modified on 1/18/2022 (am, ). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by M1 Support Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Laura Marr)(Maddalena, Yvonne). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 1/14/2022 (am, ). (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement re: #14 Notice of Deficiency by M1 Support Services. (Maddalena, Yvonne) Modified on 12/30/2021 to add linkage & clarify text as reflected in pleading (am, ). (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to M1 Support Services; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFT) M1 Support Services. (bes, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Navigator International, LLC. (Raleigh, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Navigator International, LLC.(Raleigh, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seymour Cright, III. Navigator International, LLC served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seymour Cright, III., M1 Support Services served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Conflict Disclosure Statement re: #2 Notice of Deficiency by Seymour Cright, III. (Hatchcock, Andrea) Modified on 12/9/2021 to add linkage & clarify text as reflected in pleading(am, ). (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to M1 Support Services, Navigator International, LLC and returned to counsel for personal service. (am, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Seymour Cright, III. (am, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Seymour Cright, III; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Seymour Cright, III. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against M1 Support Services, Navigator International, LLC, filed by Seymour Cright, III. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 4602065406.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt)(am, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less