This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2021 at 10:15:30 (UTC).

Crestview Genetics, LLC v. La Dolfina, S.A., LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Crestview Genetics, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against La Dolfina, S A , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00056

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crestview Genetics, LLC

Defendants

La Dolfina S.A.

Adolfo Cambiaso

La Dolfina, S.A., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason S Lewis

Attorney at DLA Piper

1900 N Pearl Avenue, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

James C Bookhout

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1900 North Pearl Street, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

George C Haratsis

Attorney at McDonald Sanders PC

777 Main St, Suite 1300

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Ellen Carol Sorrells

Attorney at McDonald Sanders PC

777 Main St, Suite 2700

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Tamara Schiffner Pullin

Attorney at McDonald Sanders PC

777 Main Street, Suite 2700

Fort Worth, TX 76102

John Thomas

Attorney at McDonald Sanders PC

777 Main Street, Suite 2700

Fort Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Appendix in Support filed by Crestview Genetics, LLC re #25 Response/Objection (Lewis, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#25

(#25) RESPONSE filed by Crestview Genetics, LLC re: #22 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Lewis, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#24

(#24) RESPONSE filed by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC re: #4 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division or, Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#23

(#23) Appendix in Support filed by Adolfo Cambiaso, La Dolfina S.A. re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#22

(#22) MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue () filed by Adolfo Cambiaso, La Dolfina S.A. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney George C Haratsis added to party Adolfo Cambiaso(pty:dft), Attorney George C Haratsis added to party La Dolfina S.A.(pty:dft) (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#21

(#21) REPLY filed by Crestview Genetics, LLC re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Lewis, Jason) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#20

(#20) Appendix in Support filed by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC re #19 Response/Objection to Motion to Remand by Plaintiff (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#13

(#18) ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (ECF No. #13 ), filed February 9, 2021. Defendants SHALL respond on or before February 17, 2021, and Plaintiff SHALL reply on or before February 19, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/10/2021) (bdb) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Adolfo Cambiaso, La Dolfina S.A. (Attachments: #1 Adolfo Cambiaso) (npk) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to issue Summons on Defendants filed by Crestview Genetics, LLC. (Bookhout, James) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#5

(#5) Appendix in Support filed by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division or, Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#4

(#24) RESPONSE filed by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC re: #4 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division or, Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (npk) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC. (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11521150) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Appendix in Support filed by Crestview Genetics, LLC re #25 Response/Objection (Lewis, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE filed by Crestview Genetics, LLC re: #22 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Lewis, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE filed by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC re: #4 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division or, Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Appendix in Support filed by Adolfo Cambiaso, La Dolfina S.A. re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue () filed by Adolfo Cambiaso, La Dolfina S.A. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney George C Haratsis added to party Adolfo Cambiaso(pty:dft), Attorney George C Haratsis added to party La Dolfina S.A.(pty:dft) (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY filed by Crestview Genetics, LLC re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Lewis, Jason) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Appendix in Support filed by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC re #19 Response/Objection to Motion to Remand by Plaintiff (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE filed by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (ECF No. #13 ), filed February 9, 2021. Defendants SHALL respond on or before February 17, 2021, and Plaintiff SHALL reply on or before February 19, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/10/2021) (bdb) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Appendix in Support filed by Crestview Genetics, LLC re #16 Response/Objection to Motion to Transfer Venue, or Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss (Lewis, Jason) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crestview Genetics, LLC. (Lewis, Jason) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to La Dolfina S.A. ; served on 1/29/2021. (Lewis, Jason) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Adolfo Cambiaso ; served on 1/29/2021. (Lewis, Jason) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Adolfo Cambiaso, La Dolfina S.A. (Attachments: #1 Adolfo Cambiaso) (npk) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to issue Summons on Defendants filed by Crestview Genetics, LLC. (Bookhout, James) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Appendix in Support filed by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division or, Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division or, Alternatively,, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () filed by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (npk) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC. (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by La Dolfina, S.A., LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11521150) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Haratsis, George) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crestview Genetics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason S. Lewis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James C. Bookhout