This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 07:28:09 (UTC).

Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC v. Urban Commons, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Crestline Hotels Resorts, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Urban Commons, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia Donahue and Mark C. Scarsi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04025

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC

Defendants

Urban Commons, LLC

Taylor Woods

Howard Wu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Charles Bolstad

Attorney at Safarian Choi and Bolstad LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1503

Christopher Alan Johnson

Attorney at Safarian Choi and Bolstad LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorney

Lisamarie McDermott

Attorney at Urtnowski and Associates PC

18301 Von Karman Avenue Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#25

#24

#23

#9

#7

#5

#3

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MINUTES (In Chambers) Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Post-Judgment Responses to Discovery and Sanctions Against Defendants Urban Commons, LLC, Taylor Woods, and Howard Wu [Dkt. Nos. 6-11.] by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear for a hearing on this matter at 11:00 AM on July 26, 2021. At the hearing, Counsel will inform the Court as to whether additional discovery has been provided and state any outstanding discovery as of that date. [See document for details.] (es) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY filed by DEFENDANTS HOWARD WU AND TAYLOR WOODS Taylor Woods, Howard Wu. (McDermott, Lisamarie) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE Regarding Discovery filed by Plaintiff Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MINUTES OF Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Post-Judgment Responses to Discovery and Sanctions Against Defendants Urban Commons, LLC, Taylor Woods, and Howard Wu [Dkt. Nos. 6-11.] (via Zoom) Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: Defendants Wu and Woods1 are ordered to provide complete responses to Plaintiff's interrogatories and requests for production of documents, along with responsive documents to Plaintiffs requests for production of documents no later than July 2, 2021. Each party is ordered to file a Notice Regarding Discovery no later than July 6, 2021. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.] The Court defers ruling on Plaintiff's request for imposition of fees, costs, and sanctions against Defendants until the Court receives Plaintiff's and Defendants' Notices. Court Reporter: Zoom Recording. (es) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Post- Judgment Responses to Discovery and Sanctions Against Defendants Urban Commons, LLC, Taylor Woods, and Howard Wu [Dkt. Nos. 6-11.] by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: Counsel for plaintiff and defendants are ordered to appear before the Court for a hearing on the motions to compel and requests for fees and costs. The hearing will be conducted remotely, via Zoom. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will contact counsel and determine the earliest possible date that they can be available. [See document for details.] (es) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY Reply in Support MOTION to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Requests for Production and Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Sanctions Against Howard Wu #10 , MOTION to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Requests for Production and Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Sanctions Against Urban Commons, LLC #6 , MOTION to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Requests for Production and Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Sanctions Against Taylor Woods #8 filed by Plaintiff Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: In accordance with the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents (ECF No. #25 , regarding Notice of Appearance #23 , filed on June 14, 2021. It is hereby ordered the document is accepted as filed. OFFICIAL case number is to read as: 2:21-cv-04025-MCS-PD. Any future document that is filed with the wrong case number or judge's initials may result in the document being stricken. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) DECLARATION of Lisamarie McDermott In Support of Defendants' Opposition To MOTION to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Requests for Production and Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Sanctions Against Howard Wu #10 , MOTION to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Requests for Production and Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Sanctions Against Urban Commons, LLC #6 , MOTION to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Requests for Production and Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Sanctions Against Taylor Woods #8 filed by Defendants Urban Commons, LLC, Taylor Woods, Howard Wu. (McDermott, Lisamarie) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lisamarie McDermott on behalf of Defendants Urban Commons, LLC, Taylor Woods, Howard Wu (Attorney Lisamarie McDermott added to party Urban Commons, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lisamarie McDermott added to party Taylor Woods(pty:dft), Attorney Lisamarie McDermott added to party Howard Wu(pty:dft))(McDermott, Lisamarie) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Requests for Production and Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Sanctions Against Howard Wu filed by Plaintiff Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION of Christopher A. Johnson in support of MOTION to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Requests for Production and Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Sanctions Against Taylor Woods #8 filed by Plaintiff Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Requests for Production and Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Sanctions Against Taylor Woods filed by Plaintiff Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Christopher A. Johnson in support of MOTION to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Requests for Production and Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Sanctions Against Urban Commons, LLC #6 filed by Plaintiff Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Responses to Post Judgment Requests for Production and Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Sanctions Against Urban Commons, LLC filed by Plaintiff Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: It appears that a writ has already been issued, see document #3 . (bm) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution re: MISC - Registration of Judgment from Another District (AO-451), #1 filed by Plaintiff Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Writ of Execution)(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Writ of Execution issued against Urban Commons, LLC, Taylor Woods, Howard Wu re: Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution, #2 . (yl) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution re: MISC - Registration of Judgment from Another District (AO-451), #1 filed by Plaintiff Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Writ of Execution)(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REGISTRATION OF JUDGMENT FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: ACACDC-30344797 - Fee: $49, filed by plaintiff Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certified Judgment) (Attorney Christopher Alan Johnson added to party Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC(pty:pla))(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRESTLINE HOTELS & RESORTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Charles Bolstad