This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 08:16:19 (UTC).

Cressler v. Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Cressler filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kansasland Tire Co , Inc of Hays, Kansas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Lungstrum and Teresa J. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01230

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Lungstrum

Referral Judge

Teresa J. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ross Cressler

Defendant

Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Jon Omlid

Attorney at DeVaughn James Injury Lawyers

3241 North Toben Street

Wichita, KS 67226

Richard W. James

Attorney at DeVaughn James Injury Lawyers

3241 North Toben Street

Wichita, KS 67226

Defendant Attorney

Jacob Lee Kurtz

Attorney at Case Linden, PC

2600 Grand Blvd., Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel must dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference deadline 10/15/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 10/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/24/2020. (byk) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#6

(#6) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jacob Lee Kurtz on behalf of Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas (Kurtz, Jacob) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas identifying None as corporate parent . (Kurtz, Jacob) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas.(Kurtz, Jacob) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified mail by Ross Cressler upon Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020 (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Ross Cressler. (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5238456.), filed by Ross Cressler.(Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket(#8) ORDER CHANGING TIME OF 11/5/2020 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On the Court's own motion, the telephone Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James will be held at the earlier time of 10:00 AM on 11/5/2020. The dial in and access numbers remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/28/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel must dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference deadline 10/15/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 10/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/24/2020. (byk) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jacob Lee Kurtz on behalf of Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas (Kurtz, Jacob) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas identifying None as corporate parent . (Kurtz, Jacob) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas.(Kurtz, Jacob) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified mail by Ross Cressler upon Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020 (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansasland Tire Co., Inc. of Hays, Kansas (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Ross Cressler. (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5238456.), filed by Ross Cressler.(Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less