This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2021 at 09:20:06 (UTC).

Crespo-Rentas et al v. Metro Pavia Health System, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Crespo-Rentas filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01321

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jose Crespo-Rentas

Francisco Crespo-Caraballo

Defendants

Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. d/b/a Dr Pila Metropolitan Hospital

Blanca Fernandez-Rodriguez

John Doe

Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Doe

Santiago Baez-Torres

Jane Doe

Conjugal Partnership Baez-Doe

Manuel Morell-Cataquet

Jane Smith

Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company

Triple S Propiedad

SINDICATO DE ASEGURADORES PARA LA SUSCRIPCION CONJUNTA DE SEGUROS DE RESPONSABILIDAD MEDICO HOSPITALARIA (SIMED)

XYZ Insurance Companies

John Smith

Richard Smith

XYZ Entities

XYZ Companies

Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. doing business as Dr. Pila Metropolitan Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alicia Margarita Santos-Irizarry

802 Ave. San Patricio, Urb. Las Lomas

San Juan, PR 00921

Defendant Attorneys

Doris Quinones-Tridas

Attorney at Quinones Tridas Law Office, PSC

33 Resolucion St, Suite 802

San Juan, PR 00920-2707

Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil

Attorney at Gonzalez Villamil Law Office

1181 Jesus T. Pinero

San Juan, PR 00920-5604

Miguel G. Laffitte

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Other Attorneys

Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle

Attorney at Morales Morales Law Offices

San Juan, Pr 00924

San Juan, PR 00924

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

1 #15

Summons Summons SIMED

1 #14

Summons Summons Triple S Propiedad

1 #13

Summons Summons Puerto Rico Medical Defense

1 #12

Summons Summons Morell-Smith

1 #11

Summons Summons Jane Smith

1 #10

Summons Summons Manuel Morell

1 #9

Summons Summons Conjugal Partnership Baez-Doe

1 #8

Summons Summons Jane Doe

1 #7

Summons Summons Santiago Baez

1 #6

Summons Summons Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Doe

1 #5

Summons Summons John Doe

1 #4

Summons Summons Blanca Fernandez

1 #3

Summons Summons Metro Pavia

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Category Sheet Category Sheet

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for extension of time until 10/02/2021 to ANSWER COMPLAINT filed by Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle on behalf of Sindicato de Aseguradoras para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED) Responses due by 9/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Del-Valle, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to dismiss without prejudice as to Sindicato de Aseguradoras para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED) filed by Alicia Margarita Santos-Irizarry on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/26/21 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Francisco Crespo-Caraballo, Jose Crespo-Rentas filed by Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil on behalf of Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company Responses due by 9/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Gonzalez-Villamil, Jose) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time until September 27, 2021 to File Answer to the complaint filed by Doris Quinones-Tridas on behalf of Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company Responses due by 9/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Tridas, Doris) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time until September 15, 2021 to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Francisco Crespo-Caraballo, Jose Crespo-Rentas filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Triple S Propiedad Responses due by 9/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Laffitte, Miguel) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Disclosure pursuant to FRCP 7.1 filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Triple S Propiedad Responses due by 9/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laffitte, Miguel) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Triple S Propiedad. (Laffitte, Miguel) Modified docket text and event on 8/25/2021 (rim). (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Santiago Baez-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Baez-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Fernandez, Conjugal Partnership Morell-Smith, Jane Doe, John Doe, Blanca Fernandez-Rodriguez, Metro Pavia Health System, Inc., Manuel Morell-Cataquet, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company, Sindicato de Aseguradoras para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED), Jane Smith, Triple S Propiedad (arg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/14/2021) (rim). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2021: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim). (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7372973.) re #1 Complaint,,, filed by Francisco Crespo-Caraballo, Jose Crespo-Rentas, filed by Francisco Crespo-Caraballo, Jose Crespo-Rentas. Related document: #1 Complaint,,, filed by Francisco Crespo-Caraballo, Jose Crespo-Rentas.(Santos-Irizarry, Alicia) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Francisco Crespo-Caraballo, Jose Crespo-Rentas. Service due by 10/12/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Metro Pavia, #4 Summons Blanca Fernandez, #5 Summons John Doe, #6 Summons Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Doe, #7 Summons Santiago Baez, #8 Summons Jane Doe, #9 Summons Conjugal Partnership Baez-Doe, #10 Summons Manuel Morell, #11 Summons Jane Smith, #12 Summons Morell-Smith, #13 Summons Puerto Rico Medical Defense, #14 Summons Triple S Propiedad, #15 Summons SIMED)(Santos-Irizarry, Alicia) Modified docket text on 7/14/2021 (rim). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Triple S Propiedad Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Puerto Rico Medical Defense is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant