This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2020 at 12:54:31 (UTC).

Crescent City Surgical Centre Operating Company, LLC v. NEXT Bio-Research Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Crescent City Surgical Centre Operating Company, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against NEXT Bio-Research Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance, Michael North and Nannette Jolivette Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02369

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael North

Presiding Judges

Sarah S. Vance

Nannette Jolivette Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crescent City Surgical Centre Operating Company, LLC

Defendant

NEXT Bio-Research Services, LLC doing business as NEXT Molecular Analytics

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Paul Monsour

Attorney at Hms LLC

404 East Gibson St

Covington, LA 70433

Preston Lee Hayes

Attorney at HMS, LLC

404 East Gibson Street

Covington, LA 70433

Barry W Sartin, Jr

3850 N. Causeway Boulevard, Ste 590

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant Attorneys

Laura F. Ashley

Attorney at Jones Walker (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Madison M. Tucker

Attorney at Jones Walker (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant is granted an additional twenty-one days to file responsive pleadings to the complaint filed by Plaintiff Crescent City Surgical Centre Operating Company, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/21/2020. (jls) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER REALLOTTING CASE: Judge Sarah S. Vance recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/21/2020.(mm) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by NEXT Bio-Research Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Madison Mary Hentze added to party NEXT Bio-Research Services, LLC(pty:dft).(Hentze, Madison) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to NEXT Bio-Research Services, LLC on (No Date Provided). (Monsour, Ryan) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/24/2020) (mm). Modified text/updated answer due date on 9/24/2020 (mm). (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#3

(#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint, Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons on the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (lt) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NEXT Bio-Research Services, LLC d/b/a NEXT Molecular Analytics (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8469632) filed by Crescent City Surgical Centre Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)Attorney Ryan Paul Monsour added to party Crescent City Surgical Centre Operating Company, LLC(pty:pla).(Monsour, Ryan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/28/2020) (lt). Modified on 8/28/2020 Waiver (lt). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant is granted an additional twenty-one days to file responsive pleadings to the complaint filed by Plaintiff Crescent City Surgical Centre Operating Company, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/21/2020. (jls) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REALLOTTING CASE: Judge Sarah S. Vance recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/21/2020.(mm) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by NEXT Bio-Research Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Madison Mary Hentze added to party NEXT Bio-Research Services, LLC(pty:dft).(Hentze, Madison) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Waiver of Service Executed. **1. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the waiver. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. 2. Date that waiver was sent was not provided on the document. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to NEXT Bio-Research Services, LLC on (No Date Provided). (Monsour, Ryan) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/24/2020) (mm). Modified text/updated answer due date on 9/24/2020 (mm). (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint, Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons on the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (lt) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NEXT Bio-Research Services, LLC d/b/a NEXT Molecular Analytics (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8469632) filed by Crescent City Surgical Centre Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)Attorney Ryan Paul Monsour added to party Crescent City Surgical Centre Operating Company, LLC(pty:pla).(Monsour, Ryan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/28/2020) (lt). Modified on 8/28/2020 Waiver (lt). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crescent City Surgical Center Operation Co., LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barry W Sartin, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Paul Monsour

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Preston Lee Hayes