This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2019 at 07:22:48 (UTC).

Creque v. Beatty, Jr.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Creque filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Beatty, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-09492

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDER CREQUE

Bronx, NY 10456

Defendant

JOHN BEATTY, JR.

Morrisville, PA 19067

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Seth Goldstein

Attorney at Law Office of Ryan S. Goldstein, PLLC

43 Westchester Square, Suite 2A

Bronx, NY 10461

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Exhibit Copy of Correspondences and Proof of Mailing

#10

(#10) LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Ryan S. Goldstein dated December 6, 2019 re: Proof of Mailing Court Order to all parties. Document filed by Alexander Creque. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Correspondences and Proof of Mailing)(Goldstein, Ryan) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The status conference currently scheduled for December 6, 2019, is adjourned to January 10, 2020, at 10:00 A.M. The parties' joint pre-conference submissions, as set forth in this Court's Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference, Dkt. 4, shall be due on or before January 2, 2020. At the conference, Plaintiff's counsel should be prepared to discuss why this action should not be transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from December 3, 2019, Dkt. 7, until December 27, 2019. Counsel for Defendant, whether that is Ms. Pullman or another attorney, must file a notice of appearance as soon as possible. If no notice of appearance or answer is filed by December 27, 2019, Plaintiff may be instructed to seek a default judgment. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for serving a copy of this Order on Defendant and providing a copy to Ms. Pullman. No later than December 6, 2019, Plaintiff's counsel must file a letter certifying that this Order has been distributed to both recipients. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/04/2019) (ama) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#8

(#8) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Ryan S. Goldstein, Esq. dated December 4, 2019. Document filed by Alexander Creque.(Goldstein, Ryan) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. John Beatty, Jr. served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. Service was accepted by Glenda Gonzalez, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Alexander Creque. (Goldstein, Ryan) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Beatty, Jr.. (dnh) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JOHN BEATTY, JR., re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Creque. (Goldstein, Ryan) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/21/2019) (rj) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against John Beatty, Jr.. Document filed by Alexander Creque.(Goldstein, Ryan) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldstein, Ryan) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against ALEXANDER CREQUE. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17770394)Document filed by ALEXANDER CREQUE.(Goldstein, Ryan) Modified on 10/16/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Ryan S. Goldstein dated December 6, 2019 re: Proof of Mailing Court Order to all parties. Document filed by Alexander Creque. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Correspondences and Proof of Mailing)(Goldstein, Ryan) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: John Beatty, Jr. answer due 12/27/2019. (ama) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The status conference currently scheduled for December 6, 2019, is adjourned to January 10, 2020, at 10:00 A.M. The parties' joint pre-conference submissions, as set forth in this Court's Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference, Dkt. 4, shall be due on or before January 2, 2020. At the conference, Plaintiff's counsel should be prepared to discuss why this action should not be transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from December 3, 2019, Dkt. 7, until December 27, 2019. Counsel for Defendant, whether that is Ms. Pullman or another attorney, must file a notice of appearance as soon as possible. If no notice of appearance or answer is filed by December 27, 2019, Plaintiff may be instructed to seek a default judgment. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for serving a copy of this Order on Defendant and providing a copy to Ms. Pullman. No later than December 6, 2019, Plaintiff's counsel must file a letter certifying that this Order has been distributed to both recipients. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/04/2019) (ama) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Ryan S. Goldstein, Esq. dated December 4, 2019. Document filed by Alexander Creque.(Goldstein, Ryan) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • NOTICE of Hearing: Please be advised that the hearing currently scheduled for Friday, December 6, 2019, will be held in Courtroom 15C at 500 Pearl Street. (anc) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. John Beatty, Jr. served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. Service was accepted by Glenda Gonzalez, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Alexander Creque. (Goldstein, Ryan) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Beatty, Jr.. (dnh) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JOHN BEATTY, JR., re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Creque. (Goldstein, Ryan) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/21/2019) (rj) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so redesignated. (wb) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against John Beatty, Jr.. Document filed by Alexander Creque.(Goldstein, Ryan) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ryan Seth Goldstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alexander Creque; John Beatty, Jr.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ryan Seth Goldstein to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldstein, Ryan) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against ALEXANDER CREQUE. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17770394)Document filed by ALEXANDER CREQUE.(Goldstein, Ryan) Modified on 10/16/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Seth Goldstein