This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2020 at 07:45:43 (UTC).

Crenshaw v. Dollar Tree Sourcing Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 Crenshaw filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dollar Tree Sourcing Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Mark S. Norris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02795

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jean Crenshaw

Defendants

Dollar Tree Stores, Inc

Dollar Tree Sourcing Company, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Temiika Gipson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey S. Rosenblum

Attorney at ROSENBLUM & REISMAN

6070 Poplar Avenue, Suite 550

Memphis, TN 38119

Matthew Thomas May

Attorney at ROSENBLUM & REISMAN

6070 Poplar Avenue, Suite 550

Memphis, TN 38119

Defendant Attorney

Ronald L. Harper

Attorney at LEITNER, WILLIAMS, DOOLEY & NAPOLITAN

3400 Players Club Parkway, Suite 122

Memphis, TN 38125

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 01/29/2020 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Harper, Ronald) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Summons

1 #3

Exhibit Affidavit of Service

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dollar Tree Sourcing Company, LLC d/b/a Dollar Tree and Dollar Tree Stores, INC., d/b/a Dollar Tree from Shelby Count Circuit Court, case number CT-4711-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3218968), filed by Dollar Tree Sourcing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Summons)(Harper, Ronald) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 01/29/2020 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Harper, Ronald) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Dollar Tree Sourcing Company, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note Civil Cover sheet has a "wet signature". Please see ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 Electronic Signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dollar Tree Sourcing Company, LLC d/b/a Dollar Tree and Dollar Tree Stores, INC., d/b/a Dollar Tree from Shelby Count Circuit Court, case number CT-4711-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3218968), filed by Dollar Tree Sourcing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Summons)(Harper, Ronald) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.