This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2022 at 08:36:26 (UTC).

Creekview IP LLC v. Belkin International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 Creekview IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Belkin International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01686

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creekview IP LLC

Defendant

Belkin International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Neal G. Massand

Defendant Attorneys

Monte Terrell Squire

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1201 North Market Street, Suite 501

Wilmington, DE 19801

Matthew S. Yungwirth

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Belkin International, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3752225.) - filed by Creekview IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Related Cases, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Related Cases

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,608,472; 8,178,773; 7,858,870. (twk) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Creekview IP LLC. (twk) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Belkin International, Inc. on 11/30/2021. (twk) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Creekview IP LLC. Belkin International, Inc. served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Monte Terrell Squire on behalf of Belkin International, Inc. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 21, 2022 - filed by Belkin International, Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew S. Yungwirth - filed by Belkin International, Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neal Massand - filed by Creekview IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement to 02/21/2022 - filed by Creekview IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#12

(#12) SO ORDERED, re #11 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement to 02/21/2022, filed by Creekview IP LLC. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/21/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SO ORDERED, re #11 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement to 02/21/2022, filed by Creekview IP LLC. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/21/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement to 02/21/2022 - filed by Creekview IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Neal G. Massand for Creekview IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neal Massand, filed by Creekview IP LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/12/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neal Massand - filed by Creekview IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew S. Yungwirth for Belkin International, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew S. Yungwirth, filed by Belkin International, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/13/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew S. Yungwirth - filed by Belkin International, Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 21, 2022, filed by Belkin International, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Belkin International, Inc. answer due 1/21/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/13/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 21, 2022 - filed by Belkin International, Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Monte Terrell Squire on behalf of Belkin International, Inc. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Creekview IP LLC. Belkin International, Inc. served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01685-CFC, 1:21-cv-01686-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Belkin International, Inc. on 11/30/2021. (twk) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Creekview IP LLC. (twk) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,608,472; 8,178,773; 7,858,870. (twk) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Belkin International, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3752225.) - filed by Creekview IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Related Cases, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELKIN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monte Terrell Squire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Sean Yungwirth