This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 07:44:11 (UTC).

Creech v. McKesson Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Creech filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against McKesson Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45134

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Creech

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Cardinal Health, Inc.

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

Anda Inc.

Henry Schein, Inc.

TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.

Cephalon, Inc.

Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. fka Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.

Noramco, Inc.

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.)

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (nka Actavis, Inc.)

Actavis LLC

Actavis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.)

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Onder

James G. Onder

Attorney at Onder Shelton O'Leary & Peterson

Second Floor, 110 East Lockwood

St. Louis, MO 63119

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (fka Depomed, Inc.) waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#6

(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#9

(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Henry Schein, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#10

(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#11

(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#12

(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#13

(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.) waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#14

(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.) waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Henry Schein, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (fka Depomed, Inc.) waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Christopher Creech. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Christopher Creech (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.), Allergan Finance, LLC (fka Actavis, Inc. fka Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc.), Allergan PLC (fka Actavis PLC), Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Anda Inc., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (fka Depomed, Inc.), CVS Indiana LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Doe 1-100, being those persons, firms, corporations, agents, servants and/or employees who authorized, ordered and/or committed the acts described in this Complaint and whose names when ascertained wi, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Indivior, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. fka Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Kroger Limited Partnership II, McKesson Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.), Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (dba Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.), TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., The Kroger Co., Wal-Mart Inc. (fka Walmart Stores, Inc.), Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (nka Actavis, Inc.). Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11186032. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-dap. Filed by Christopher Creech. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Onder, James) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Actavis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) is a litigant

Latest cases where Noramco Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Pharmaceuticals Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant