This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2019 at 07:05:44 (UTC).

Creative Impact Inc. et al v. The 475 Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 Creative Impact Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The 475 Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05907

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zuru LLC

Zuru Inc.

Creative Impact Inc.

songc

Eagle eye

Defendants

yours-ours

china qin

hly1987

liuxiqing

cml-25

fu2016

Guvi

xiaoqiaomei8

Geek

Gift World

Sweetie.ni

xiangpingda68392

The 475 Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships

Sweet Hours

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Allen Kurtz

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC

55 E. Monroe St., Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

28 #1

Declaration Nicholas A. Kurtz

#28

8 #7

Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 43-68

8 #6

Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 19-42

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal of certain defendants pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(i) #34 , the following defendants are dismissed with prejudice li22xuling56972, NAGOLEN, to-the-better, CVhart, JiefuKUKU, Justfitforu, Lehu Trading Co., Ltd., Shanghai Baocheng Lighting Co., Ltd, sunnygee and wenrn. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal of certain defendants pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(i) #32 , the following defendants are dismissed with prejudice Little Radish Store, Angel beast, Casual Shop NO.1, hello123world, losangeles45, Magic Martin, santafe, and My_Toy Store. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 10/18/2019. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiffs' motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #28 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Status hearing set for 10/22/19 is stricken. No appearance necessary on 10/22/19. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas Allen Kurtz for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #28 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 10/22/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration Nicholas A. Kurtz)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Pursuant to plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal of certain defendants pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(i) #26 , the following defendants are dismissed with prejudice cml-25, xiangpingda68392, liuxiqing, Sweetie.ni, Eagle eye, yours-ours, china qin, fu2016, Geek, Gift World, Guvi, hly1987, lingjun, MenB, Rimiut, songc, Sweet Hours, viviann, xiaoqiaomei8, xiataotaostore, and zhangyi138546. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC to seal document sealed document #2 , sealed document,, #9 (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jessica Arnaiz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 1-18, #2 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 19-42, #3 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 43-68, #4 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 69-88, #5 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 89-109, #6 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 110-138, #7 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 139-192, #8 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 193-252, #9 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 253-306, #10 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 307-356, #11 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 357-408, #12 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 409-456, #13 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 457-475)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC for temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Stephen Drysdale, #3 Declaration Nicholas A. Kurtz, #4 Declaration Jessica Arnaiz, #5 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 1-18, #6 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 19-42, #7 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 43-68, #8 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 69-88, #9 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 89-109, #10 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 110-138, #11 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 139-192, #12 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 193-252, #13 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 253-306, #14 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 307-356, #15 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 357-408, #16 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 409-456, #17 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - Redacted - DOES 457-475)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC for leave to file excess pages (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF CLAIMS INVOLVING TRADEMARKS by Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC by Nicholas Allen Kurtz (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SCHEDULE a to Complaint by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC Schedule A to Complaint (Kurtz, Nicholas) Modified on 10/21/2019 (kp, ). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16200459.(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creative Impact Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Zuru Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Allen Kurtz