This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2019 at 07:08:42 (UTC).

Creative Impact Inc. et al v. The 425 Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 Creative Impact Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The 425 Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05630

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zuru LLC

Zuru Inc.

Creative Impact Inc.

Creative Impact (Hong Kong) Limited

Defendant

The 425 Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Allen Kurtz

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC

55 E. Monroe St., Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorney

Simon Timothy Barnes

9455 Ne Alderwood Road, C/O Myp-Dwrm

Portland, OR 97220-1696

 

Court Documents

#39

38 #1

Exhibit A

#38

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

8 #26

Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 415-425

8 #21

Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 284-334

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) AMENDED Answer by The 425 Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto to (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barnes, Simon) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ANSWER to Complaint by The 425 Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto(Barnes, Simon) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ANSWER to Complaint by The 425 Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto(Barnes, Simon) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status hearing set for 11/20/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/27/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status and motion hearing held on 9/27/2019. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #22 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Creative Impact (Hong Kong) Limited, Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 1-18, #2 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 19-35, #3 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 36-43, #4 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 44-55, #5 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 56-99, #6 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 100-137, #7 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 138-145, #8 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 146-153, #9 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 154-162, #10 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 163-176, #11 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 177-187, #12 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 188-201, #13 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 202-215, #14 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 216-235, #15 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 236-253, #16 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 254-283, #17 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 284-334, #18 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 335-384, #19 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 385-398, #20 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 399-406, #21 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 407-414, #22 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex 1 - DOE 415-425)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact (Hong Kong) Limited, Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC for temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Drysdale, #3 Declaration Kurtz, #4 Declaration Arnaiz, #5 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 1-18, #6 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 19-35, #7 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 36-43, #8 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 44-55, #9 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 56-99, #10 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 100-137, #11 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 138-145, #12 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 146-153, #13 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 154-162, #14 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 163-176, #15 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 177-187, #16 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 188-201, #17 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 202-215, #18 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 216-235, #19 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 236-253, #20 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 254-283, #21 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 284-334, #22 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 335-384, #23 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 385-398, #24 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 399-406, #25 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 407-414, #26 Exhibit Arnaiz - Ex 1 - Redacted - DOE 415-425)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Plaintiffs Creative Impact (Hong Kong) Limited, Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC for leave to file excess pages (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, ) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF CLAIMS INVOLVING TRADEMARKS by Creative Impact (Hong Kong) Limited, Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Creative Impact (Hong Kong) Limited, Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC by Nicholas Allen Kurtz (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Creative Impact (Hong Kong) Limited, Creative Impact Inc., Zuru Inc., Zuru LLC Schedule A to Complaint (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Zuru Inc., Creative Impact Inc., Zuru LLC, Creative Impact (Hong Kong) Limited; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16159031.(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creative Impact Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Zuru Inc. is a litigant