This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 09:18:21 (UTC).

Creative Choice Homes XXXI, LLC v. MG Affordable Master, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Creative Choice Homes XXXI, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MG Affordable Master, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William P. Dimitrouleas and William Matthewman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-MC-81113

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

Referral Judge

William Matthewman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Creative Choice Homes XXXI, LLC

Creative Choice Homes XXXI, Inc.

Defendants

MG GTC Middle Tier I, LLC

MG GTC Fund I, LLC

MG Affordable Master, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A. Evan Dix

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson PA

101 E. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

Justin Jenkins

Attorney at BC Davenport LLC

801 S. Marquette Ave., Suite 200

Minneaplois, MN 55402

Sean M. Zaroogian

Attorney at BC Davenport LLC

801 S. Marquette Ave., Suite 200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Zachary James Bancroft

Attorney at Baker Donelson et al

200 S Orange Avenue, Suite 2900

Orlando, FL 32801

David A. Davenport

Attorney at BC Davenport LLC

801 S. Marquette Ave., Suite 200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Scott Alan McLaren

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson

101 E. Kennedy Blvd, Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

Desislava K. Docheva

3307 Port Royale Drive South, Apt. 307

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308

Eve Alexis Cann

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC

100 S.E. Third Avenue, Suite 1620

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

Laura Carlilse

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Steven F. Griffith, Jr.

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC

201 St Charles Avenue, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

J. Alexandra Bruce

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#5

#6

#7

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Exhibit

9 #2

Exhibit

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER CLOSING CASE Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER: In light of the Notice of Resolution of Motion to Quash #9 , the Motion hearing set for July 8, 2021 is hereby CANCELED. The Court appreciates the professionalism of the parties' counsel in amicably resolving this matter. The parties and non-parties shall comply with their agreement as described in the Notice #9 . The Non-Parties' Expedited Motion to Quash Subpoenas or in the Alternative for a Protective Order #1 is hereby DENIED as moot based upon the parties' agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 7/6/2021. (jb02) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by MG Affordable Master, LLC, MG GTC Fund I, LLC, MG GTC Middle Tier I, LLC of Resolution of Motion to Quash (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Cann, Eve) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER: This miscellaneous case is before the Court sua sponte. The Defendants in an action pending in the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Case No. 19-cv-01910-TPB-AAS, issued subpoenas commanding Non-Parties, Naimisha Construction, Inc. ("NCI") and NB Florida Holdings, LLLP ("NBFL") (together, "Non-Parties") to testify at a deposition [1-1 & 3]. The Non-Parties, through counsel, filed an Expedited Motion to Quash Subpoenas or in the Alternative for a Protective Order ("Motion") #1 . According to the Motion, on June 9, 2021, Defendants unilaterally noticed the depositions for the Non-Parties. The deposition of NCI was noticed to take place on June 24, 2021 [1-1] and the deposition of NBFL was noticed to take place on June 28, 2021 [1-3]. Both subpoenas were served on the Non-Parties on June 10, 2021 [1-2 & 4]. The discovery cutoff in the Middle District case is June 30, 2021, but counsel for the Defendants and Non-Parties continue to bicker over the two Non-Party depositions. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing on the pending Expedited Motion shall be held on July 8, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned via Zoom video teleconference. The undersigned's CRD shall issue log-in information to counsel at a later date. Defendants shall file a response to the Non-Parties' Expedited Motion no later than 3:00 p.m. on July 6, 2021. The Non-Parties may file a reply no later than 3:00 p.m. on July 7, 2021. No continuances of the hearing or briefing scheduled shall be entertained. Further, the Court advises Defendants and their counsel, and the Non-Parties and their counsel, to carefully consider their respective positions and apparent lack of professionalism and cooperation as to this dispute as the Court intends to seriously consider the imposition of sanctions and/or cost shifting as deemed appropriate against Defendants and their counsel or the Non-Parties and their counsel pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45, 37, 26 and other applicable rules or law. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 7/1/2021. (jb02) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Referring Case To Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney J. Alexandra Bruce, mailing date June 25, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney A. Evan Dix, David A. Davenport, Sean M. Zaroogian, Justin Jenkins, Steven Griffith, Laura Carlilse, mailing date June 24, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee $49.00, receipt number AFLSDC-14794175, Electronic Miscellaneous Case Filing re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Sundarsingh, Mandell) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $49.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (kpe) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (kpe) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Expedited Third Party Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Quash from Another District filed by Naimisha Construction, Inc. and NB Florida Holdings, LLLP. NOT PAID/NO IFP FILED. Filing fee $49.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 State Court Complaint/Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Civil Cover Sheet/Exhibit)(Sundarsingh, Mandell) Modified text on 6/24/2021 (kpe). (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MG GTC MIDDLE TIER II LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MG AFFORDABLE MASTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Desislava K. Docheva