This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2021 at 09:32:32 (UTC).

Creative Artists Agency, LLC et al v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 Creative Artists Agency, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Affiliated FM Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Gail J. Standish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08314

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Creative Artists Agency, LLC

CAA Holdings, LLC

Defendants

Affiliated FM Insurance Company

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy J Osher

Attorney at Boren Osher and Luftman LLP

222 North Pacific Coast Highway Suite 2222

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Lewis Allender

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Amy M Churan

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/19/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Creative Artists Agency, LLC, CAA Holdings, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/10/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company, (Allender, Daniel) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Allender, Daniel) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 21STCV33426 Receipt No: ACACDC-32186214 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Daniel Lewis Allender added to party Affiliated FM Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Allender, Daniel) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases where AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy M. Churan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Lewis Allender