This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2021 at 09:08:25 (UTC).

Creal et al v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Creal filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-13439

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Julie Creal

Blanca Penaloza

Adeltraud Parnagian

Marianne Green

Michael McAffee

Kelly Kaltenbach

Juliet Mills

Rhonda Sue Motler

Donna Powell

Melba King

Agnes Margerum

Dana Rambo

Nefertiti Edwards

Jane Flynn

Karen Ly

Kassandra Hardin

Shamonda Owens

Brooke Riva

Defendant

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi

Attorney at DONALD L. SCHLAPPRIZZI, P.C.

One Metropolitan Square, Suite 2430

St. Louis, MO 63102

MARK P ROBINSON, Jr

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

Beth A. Bauer

Attorney at HeplerBroom LLC - Edwardsville

130 North Main Street, P.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Mary Elizabeth Dyer Kellett

Attorney at HEPLER BROOM

130 N. Main Street, P.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0510

Other Attorneys

CAROLINE M. TINSLEY

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

100 South Fourth Street, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63102

JANET LYNN POLETTO

Attorney at HARDIN, KUNDLA, MCKEON, POLETTO & POLIFRONI, PC

673 Morris Avenue, Po Box 730

Springfield, NJ 07081-0730

 

Court Documents

42 #3

Exhibit A

42 #2

Certification of Caroline M. Tinsley, Esq.

41 #9

Exhibit G

41 #8

Exhibit F

41 #7

Exhibit E

41 #5

Exhibit C

41 #4

Exhibit B

41 #3

Exhibit A

41 #41

Main Document

1 #8

Original Filing Form

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #42 MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement, #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement by PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement, #2 Certification of Caroline M. Tinsley, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Caroline M. Tinsley, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Short Form Complaint by Julie Creal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROBINSON, MARK) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Appearance by JANET LYNN POLETTO on behalf of PTI Royston, LLC (POLETTO, JANET) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Appearance by JANET LYNN POLETTO on behalf of PTI Union, LLC (POLETTO, JANET) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#10) Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Mark P. Robinson, Jr. Review of case shows that Attorney Mark P. Robinson, Jr is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JKL) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Agnes Margerum, Juliet Mills, Blanca Penaloza, Shamonda Owens, Julie Creal, Brooke Riva, Nefertiti Edwards, Kassandra Hardin, Kelly Kaltenbach, Adeltraud Parnagian, Donna Powell, Dana Rambo, Jane Flynn, Karen Ly, Rhonda Sue Motler, Marianne Green, Rita Williams, Melba King, Michael McAffee.(JKL) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson.. (Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Dyer Kellett for Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Kellett, Mary Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, State of MO, case number 21SL-CC01774, with receipt number AMOEDC-8723801, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Original Filing Form)(Bauer, Beth) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JANET LYNN POLETTO