This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2020 at 09:17:15 (UTC).

Crawley v. Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Crawley filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Indian Harbor Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Philip A. Brimmer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02272

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedric Crawley

Defendant

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DezaRae D. LaCrue

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Pueblo

400 North Main Street

Pueblo, CO 81004

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan Christopher Gill

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Wells Fargo Center, Suite 4000

Denver, CO 80203

Benjamin Warren Hudgens

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Wells Fargo Center, Suite 4000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/28/2020. ORDERED that, on or before October 6, 2020, defendant shall show cause as to why this case should not be remanded to state court due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction or due to improper removal. (sphil, ) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#13

(#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Gill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#12

(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Gill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Hudgens, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by DezaRae D. LaCrue on behalf of Cedric CrawleyAttorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Cedric Crawley(pty:pla) (LaCrue, DezaRae) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Benjamin W. Hudgens by Benjamin Warren Hudgens on behalf of Indian Harbor Insurance CompanyAttorney Benjamin Warren Hudgens added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Hudgens, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#6

(#6) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Motion Extension of Time by Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Indian Harbor Insurance Company on 06/15/2020, filed by Plaintiff Cedric Crawley (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against Indian Harbor Insurance Company, filed by Cedric Crawley.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit G - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal of State Action to U.S. District

1 #10

Exhibit F - Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond

1 #9

Exhibit F - Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise

1 #7

Exhibit F - Delay Reduction Order

1 #4

Exhibit D - Delaware Secretary of State Certificate

1 #3

Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Indian Harbor Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020CV31106. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7415390), filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Delaware Secretary of State Certificate, #5 Exhibit E - Colorado Division of Insurance Online Information, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Docket, #7 Exhibit F - Delay Reduction Order, #8 Exhibit F - Entry of Appearance, #9 Exhibit F - Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, #10 Exhibit F - Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, #11 Exhibit G - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal of State Action to U.S. District Court, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Gill, Ryan) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket(#16) Minute Order: The Parties did not consent to jurisdiction by magistrate judge. Subsequently, the matter was redrawn to District Chief Judge Brimmer 14 . The Scheduling Conference set for 9-29-2020 in front of Magistrate Judge Crews is VACATED pending the outcome of Chief Judge Brimmer's Show Cause Order. In anticipation Judge Brimmer will refer this matter to Magistrate Crews pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), the 16(b) Scheduling Conference is re-set for 10-21-2020 at 9:30 am. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 09-28-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/28/2020. ORDERED that, on or before October 6, 2020, defendant shall show cause as to why this case should not be remanded to state court due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction or due to improper removal. (sphil, ) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02272-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Gill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Gill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Hudgens, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 9/22/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #7 ) is due on or before 9/22/2020. At the scheduled time, Counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/4/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by DezaRae D. LaCrue on behalf of Cedric CrawleyAttorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Cedric Crawley(pty:pla) (LaCrue, DezaRae) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Benjamin W. Hudgens by Benjamin Warren Hudgens on behalf of Indian Harbor Insurance CompanyAttorney Benjamin Warren Hudgens added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Hudgens, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Motion Extension of Time by Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Indian Harbor Insurance Company on 06/15/2020, filed by Plaintiff Cedric Crawley (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Indian Harbor Insurance Company, filed by Cedric Crawley.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Indian Harbor Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020CV31106. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7415390), filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Delaware Secretary of State Certificate, #5 Exhibit E - Colorado Division of Insurance Online Information, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Docket, #7 Exhibit F - Delay Reduction Order, #8 Exhibit F - Entry of Appearance, #9 Exhibit F - Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, #10 Exhibit F - Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, #11 Exhibit G - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal of State Action to U.S. District Court, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Gill, Ryan) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Christopher Gill