This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:43:35 (UTC).

Crawford v. Sheriff et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Crawford filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Sheriff. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07584

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dionte Crawford

Defendants

Tom Dart

Parker Sheriff

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER: Plaintiff's renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #6 is taken under consideration. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this action, he must (1) explain in writing and under oath why he should be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis and (2) submit a certified trust fund statement showing activity in his account from December 1, 2019, to the date he responds to this order. If Plaintiff was incarcerated at more than one facility during that time, he must provide a certified trust fund account statement from each facility at which he was incarcerated. Alternatively, he may pay the Court's $400.00 filing fee; payment may be made by check or money order payable to Clerk, United States District Court. Failure to comply with this order by February 3, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice to renewal should this case progress to a point where counsel becomes necessary. See Pickett v. Chicago Transit Auth., 930 F.3d 869, 871 (7th Cir. 2019) (suggesting that motion for attorney representation is premature if filed "so early in the case that it was impossible to tell whether [the plaintiff] could represent himself adequately"). The Court defers review of Plaintiff's complaint until his fee status has been resolved. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/13/2020. Mailed notice(smm, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Dionte Crawford for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (Envelope not postmarked) (bg, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wants to proceed to screening under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, he must either (1) prepay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00; or (2) submit a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with the instructions in the statement section of this order. Failure to comply with this order by December 23, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the Court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this case for failure to comply with a Court order and for want of prosecution. The Court defers ruling on Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation until after his fee status has been resolved. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/25/2019. Mailed notice (smm, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Dionte Crawford for attorney representation. (smm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Dionte Crawford for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (smm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

1 #1

Envelope not postmarked

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Dionte Crawford; (Attachments) (Attachments: #1 Envelope not postmarked). (Envelope not postmarked).(smm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Plaintiff's renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #6 is taken under consideration. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this action, he must (1) explain in writing and under oath why he should be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis and (2) submit a certified trust fund statement showing activity in his account from December 1, 2019, to the date he responds to this order. If Plaintiff was incarcerated at more than one facility during that time, he must provide a certified trust fund account statement from each facility at which he was incarcerated. Alternatively, he may pay the Court's $400.00 filing fee; payment may be made by check or money order payable to Clerk, United States District Court. Failure to comply with this order by February 3, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice to renewal should this case progress to a point where counsel becomes necessary. See Pickett v. Chicago Transit Auth., 930 F.3d 869, 871 (7th Cir. 2019) (suggesting that motion for attorney representation is premature if filed "so early in the case that it was impossible to tell whether [the plaintiff] could represent himself adequately"). The Court defers review of Plaintiff's complaint until his fee status has been resolved. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/13/2020. Mailed notice(smm, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Dionte Crawford for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (Envelope not postmarked) (bg, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • MAILED Copy of Order dated 11/25/19, a blank application to proceed informa pauperis to Plaintiff Dionte Crawford. (smm, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wants to proceed to screening under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, he must either (1) prepay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00; or (2) submit a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with the instructions in the statement section of this order. Failure to comply with this order by December 23, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the Court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this case for failure to comply with a Court order and for want of prosecution. The Court defers ruling on Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation until after his fee status has been resolved. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/25/2019. Mailed notice (smm, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Dionte Crawford for attorney representation. (smm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Dionte Crawford for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (smm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Dionte Crawford; (Attachments) (Attachments: #1 Envelope not postmarked). (Envelope not postmarked).(smm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.