This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 09:30:33 (UTC).

Crawford v. Flint Medical Staffing Inc

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Crawford filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Flint Medical Staffing Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00322

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Crawford

Defendant

Flint Medical Staffing Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katie L Templeton

Attorney at Clark & Mitchell PC

101 Park Ave, Suite 210

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Steven E Clark

Attorney at Clark & Mitchell PC

101 Park Ave, Suite 210

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Heather Johnson Mitchell

Attorney at Clark & Mitchell PC

101 Park Ave, Suite 210

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Lane O Krieger

Attorney at Wiggins Sewell & Ogletree

210 Park Ave, Suite 3100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Michael T Leake, Jr

Attorney at Wiggins Sewell & Ogletree

210 Park Ave, Suite 3100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to amend due 90 days from today; Motions in limine due 7/1/20; Jury instructions due 7/1/20; Voir dire requests due 7/1/20; Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/14/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 302 before Honorable David L. Russell. Motions due by 5/4/2020. Pretrial Report due by 7/1/2020.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 7/2/19. (jw) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#10

(#10) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Michael Crawford. (Mitchell, Heather) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#9

(#9) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2019 09:45 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 6/24/2019. (jw) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Leake, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Defendants . (Leake, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael T Leake, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Leake, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Lane O Krieger on behalf of All Defendants (Krieger, Lane) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Crawford. All Plaintiffs. (Clark, Steven) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Crawford. All Plaintiffs. (Clark, Steven) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Flint Medical Staffing Inc. (kmt) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Flint Medical Staffing Inc filed by Michael Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to amend due 90 days from today; Motions in limine due 7/1/20; Jury instructions due 7/1/20; Voir dire requests due 7/1/20; Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/14/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 302 before Honorable David L. Russell. Motions due by 5/4/2020. Pretrial Report due by 7/1/2020.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 7/2/19. (jw) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Michael Crawford. (Mitchell, Heather) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2019 09:45 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 6/24/2019. (jw) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Leake, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Defendants . (Leake, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael T Leake, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Leake, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Lane O Krieger on behalf of All Defendants (Krieger, Lane) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Crawford. All Plaintiffs. (Clark, Steven) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Crawford. All Plaintiffs. (Clark, Steven) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2899246. (Clark, Steven) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Flint Medical Staffing Inc. (kmt) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Flint Medical Staffing Inc filed by Michael Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.