This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 13:52:45 (UTC).

CRAWFORD v. DAVIS

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 CRAWFORD filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against DAVIS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew P. Brookman and James Patrick Hanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00916

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYLER CRAWFORD

Defendant

STORMS

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Envelope

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Envelope

#3

2 #44

Envelope

2 #43

Proposed USM-285 forms

2 #41

Exhibit ZZ chronology

2 #40

Exhibit L Witness List/Evidence

2 #39

Exhibit BBBB excessive force

2 #24

Exhibit VV Acknowledgment of Appeal

2 #20

Exhibit HHH Grievance Appeal

2 #19

Exhibit EEEE Receipt-Administrative Remedy

2 #4

Exhibit RRR Grievance Appeal

2 #2

Exhibit RR Offender Grievance Response Report

2 #1

Exhibit DD Administrative Remedy

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by TYLER CRAWFORD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #3 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Six Dollars and Fifty- Two Cents ($6.52). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through May 26, 2021, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. The plaintiff is informed that after the initial partial filing fee is paid, he will be obligated to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income each month that the amount in his account exceeds $10.00, until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). After the initial partial filing fee is received, a collection order will be issued to the plaintiff and the plaintiff's custodian, and the Court will screen the complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915A. (Copies mailed pursuant to distribution list) Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 4/29/2021. (JDC) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis originally filed by Plaintiff TYLER CRAWFORD on October 29, 2020, under Cause No. 1:20-cv-2823-SEB-TAB (Document 2). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against STORMS, originally filed by TYLER CRAWFORD on February 3, 2021 under Cause No. 1:20-cv-2823-SEB-TAB (Document 16). (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DD Administrative Remedy, #2 Exhibit RR Offender Grievance Response Report, #3 Exhibit SSS Offender Grievance, #4 Exhibit RRR Grievance Appeal, #5 Exhibit DDD Appeal, #6 Exhibit AAA Receipt-Administrative Remedy, #7 Exhibit WWW Offender Grievance, #8 Exhibit FFF Grievance Appeal, #9 Exhibit GGG Grievance Appeal, #10 Exhibit HHH Grievance Appeal, #11 Exhibit BBB Offender Grievance Response Report, #12 Exhibit EEE Appeal, #13 Exhibit CC Receipt-Administrative Remedy, #14 Exhibit TTT Offender Grievance, #15 Exhibit FFF Grievance Appeal, #16 Exhibit SS Offender Grievance Response Report, #17 Exhibit SSSS Offender Grievance Response Report, #18 Exhibit CCC Appeal, #19 Exhibit EEEE Receipt-Administrative Remedy)(DJH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2021: #20 Exhibit HHH Grievance Appeal, #21 Exhibit VVV Offender Grievance, #22 Exhibit UUU Offender Grievance, #23 Exhibit GG Offender Grievance Response Report, #24 Exhibit VV Acknowledgment of Appeal, #25 Exhibit EE Receipt-Administrative Remedy, #26 Exhibit OOO Offender Grievance Response Report, #27 Exhibit QQQ Offender Grievance, #28 Exhibit BB Request for Interview, #29 Exhibit OO Request for Interview, #30 Exhibit NN Request for Interview, #31 Exhibit FF Offender Grievance, #32 Exhibit II Return of Grievance, #33 Exhibit JJ Offender Grievance, #34 Exhibit KK Request for Interview, #35 Exhibit LL Return of Grievance, #36 Exhibit LLL Notice of Tort Claim, #37 Exhibit NNN signature page, #38 Exhibit TT Declaration of Samson Koryeyon, #39 Exhibit BBBB excessive force, #40 Exhibit L Witness List/Evidence, #41 Exhibit ZZ chronology) (DJH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2021: #42 Proposed Summons, #43 Proposed USM-285 forms, #44 Envelope) (DJH). Modified on 4/15/2021 -- main document replaced, docket text updated for Defendant's name (DJH). (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/15/2021) (DJH). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER Severing the Amended Complaint, Dismissing Deficient Claims, and Directing the Service of Process signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/12/2021 in Cause No. 1:20-cv-2823-SEB-TAB. The Clerk is directed to open two new civil actions in accordance with the instructions set forth in Part IV of this Order.(DJH) Modified on 4/15/2021 to add case number (DJH). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less