This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 15:28:10 (UTC).

Crawford v. Colonial Life and Accident Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Crawford filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Colonial Life and Accident Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph M. Hood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00234

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph M. Hood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Dawn Crawford

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Colonial Life and Accident Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Jessica Katherine Winters

Attorney at The Winters Law Group LLC

423 S. Broadway, Suite 2B

Lexington, KY 40508

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Ann Michelle Turner

Attorney at Turner, Keal & Button PLLC

10624 Meeting Street, Suite 101

Prospect, KY 40059

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Record

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

4 #1

Exhibit A (1/4/18 letter)

4 #2

Exhibit B (3/28/18 letter)

#5

5 #1

MJ Consent Form

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: (1) No motions to compel, nor any other motions relating to a discovery dispute, shall be filed unless all counsel involved in such dispute have first conferred; (2) The Court encourages early and economic case resolution including by mediation. Parties SHALL immediately assess any potential for agreed resolution and continue to make that assessment as litigation continues; (3) Initial disclosures due by 8/1/2020; (4) Discovery related to ERISA and advise the Court as to their agreement that applies or does not apply or propose a schedule to the Court by 9/21/2020; (5) Within 15 days of any agreement by the parties or the Courts determination that ERISA applies, the parties shall propose a schedule to the Court for submission ofthe administrative record and briefing; and (6) If the parties agree, or the Court determines, that ERISA does not apply, the parties shall file a joint status report containing the information requested in the Court's 6/9/2020, Order [DE #5 ] NLT 15 days after the parties' agreement or the Court's determination. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/21/2020.(JJ)cc: COR (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MDC) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENTAL FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Colonial Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group, Other Affiliate Claims Services International Limited, Other Affiliate Duncanson & Holt Canada Ltd., Other Affiliate Duncanson & Holt Europe Ltd., Other Affiliate Duncanson & Holt, Inc., Other Affiliate Provident Life and Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Provident Investment Management, LLC, Other Affiliate The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate UNUM European Holding Company Limited, Other Affiliate UNUM Limited, Other Affiliate Always Care Benefits, Inc., Other Affiliate Claims Assisance (UK) Limited, Other Affiliate Fairwind Insurance Company, Other Affiliate First Look Vision Network, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Fundacja Unum, Other Affiliate H&J Capital, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Leave Logic, Inc., Other Affiliate National Dental Plan Limited, Other Affiliate Provident Financing Trust, Other Affiliate Starmount Insurance Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate Starmount Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate UDVAS, LLC, Other Affiliate UnumProvident Finance Company Limited, Other Affiliate Unum Zycie Towarzystwo Ubezpieczen i Reasekuracji Spolka Akcyjna, Other Affiliate Northwind Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Northwind Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate Unum Ireland Limited, Other Affiliate Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Unum Life Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate First Unum Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate UNUM Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Unum Select Limited for Colonial Life and Accident Insurance Company, Colonial Life and Accident Insurance Company.. (Turner, Ann) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Turner, Ann) Modified Filers on 7/17/2020 (MDC). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: 1) W/in 21 days from the date of service of this order, parties shall meet to discuss the nature and basis of their claims & defenses and possibilities for a settlement or resolution of the case. 2) W/in 10 days after meeting parties shall file a joint status report containing: a) the discovery plan; b) parties' estimate of time necessary to file pretrial motions; c) probably length of trial; d) dates mutually convenient for trial; e) decision as to whether the action may be referred to a USMJ; f) determination whether resolution of case may be aided by mediation or other special procedures. 3) Each party is directed to advise the Court at the time of the submission of the joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners w/ which it is associated, to the extent the party has not already done so. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 06/09/2020. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form) (MDC) cc: COR (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (MDC) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Dawn Crawford by Colonial Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (1/4/18 letter), #2 Exhibit B (3/28/18 letter))(Turner, Ann) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (MDC) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Colonial Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group Corporation for Colonial Life and Accident Insurance Company. (MDC) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Crawford via Certified Mail to Colonial Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 5/11/2020. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE #1 . (MDC) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison County Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00217. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4683584), filed by Colonial Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ann Michelle Turner