This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2021 at 11:20:04 (UTC).

Cranmore et al v. Reel

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Cranmore filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Reel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00413

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Floyd W. Cranmore

Adam Cranmore

Defendant

Paul A. Reel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C. Merle Gile

Attorney at C. Merle Gile, Inc., PC

411 Nw 5Th St

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Delia Druley

Attorney at US Attorney (SD-Sioux Falls)

Po Box 2638

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

Susan S. Brandon

Attorney at US Attorney (OKED)

520 Denison Ave

Muskogee, OK 74401

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting hearing(s): Settlement Conference set for 11/3/2021 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Settlement Conference Statements due 10/20/2021.(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 3/26/2021; Joinder of Parties due by 3/26/2021; Exhibit List due by 9/24/2021; Witness List due by 9/24/2021; Discovery due by 10/25/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2021; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 12/3/2021; Pretrial Order due by 12/3/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Non Jury Trial set for 12/21/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4, Room 420, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. The Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#12

(#12) Joint STATUS REPORT by Paul A. Reel (Druley, Delia) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) by Paul A. Reel (Druley, Delia) Modified on 12/31/2020 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

10 #1

Consent or Reassignment Form

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for Friday, January 15, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by Monday, January 11, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form)(pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) by Adam Cranmore (Gile, C.) Modified on 12/15/2020 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) by Floyd W. Cranmore Responses due by 12/14/2020(Gile, C.) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#6

(#6) BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by Paul A. Reel ;(Druley, Delia) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Paul A. Reel Responses due by 12/1/2020(Druley, Delia) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Delia Druley on behalf of Paul A. Reel (Druley, Delia) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

2 #7

Exhibit 2-E - Summons

2 #6

Exhibit 2-D - Summons

2 #5

Exhibit 2-C - Order of Recusal

2 #4

Exhibit 2-B - State Court Summons

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Scope Certificate

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting hearing(s): Settlement Conference set for 11/3/2021 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Settlement Conference Statements due 10/20/2021.(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 3/26/2021; Joinder of Parties due by 3/26/2021; Exhibit List due by 9/24/2021; Witness List due by 9/24/2021; Discovery due by 10/25/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2021; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 12/3/2021; Pretrial Order due by 12/3/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Non Jury Trial set for 12/21/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4, Room 420, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. The Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint STATUS REPORT by Paul A. Reel (Druley, Delia) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) by Paul A. Reel (Druley, Delia) Modified on 12/31/2020 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for Friday, January 15, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by Monday, January 11, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form)(pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) by Adam Cranmore (Gile, C.) Modified on 12/15/2020 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder granting #7 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Re: #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction). Accordingly, Plaintiff has until Tuesday, December 15, 2020 to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dimiss. (pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) by Floyd W. Cranmore Responses due by 12/14/2020(Gile, C.) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by Paul A. Reel ;(Druley, Delia) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Paul A. Reel Responses due by 12/1/2020(Druley, Delia) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Delia Druley on behalf of Paul A. Reel (Druley, Delia) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Johnston County District Court, case number CJ-20-14 by Paul A. Reel (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Paul A. Reel (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Paul A. Reel by Adam Cranmore, Floyd W. Cranmore (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less