This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2021 at 08:20:00 (UTC).

Crane Carrier Company v. Sigma Powertrain, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Crane Carrier Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sigma Powertrain, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David R. Grand and Robert H. Cleland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-11295

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

Presiding Judge

Robert H. Cleland

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Crane Carrier Company

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Sigma Powertrain, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J. Boettcher

Attorney at Plunkett & Cooney (Bloomfield Hills)

38505 Woodward Avenue, Suite 100

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304-5097

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Dirk A. Beamer

Attorney at Wright Beamer

31500 Northwestern Hwy, Suite 140

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

 

Court Documents

#7

#6

5 #9

Exhibit Emails

5 #8

Exhibit Emails

5 #7

Exhibit Emails

5 #6

Exhibit Invoice

5 #5

Exhibit Quotations

5 #4

Exhibit Purchase Order

5 #3

Exhibit Quotation

5 #2

Exhibit Emails

5 #1

Index of Exhibits

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit C - Email re: canceling order

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2021 11:30 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Beamer, Dirk) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COUNTERCLAIM filed by All Defendants against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Emails, #3 Exhibit Quotation, #4 Exhibit Purchase Order, #5 Exhibit Quotations, #6 Exhibit Invoice, #7 Exhibit Emails, #8 Exhibit Emails, #9 Exhibit Emails) (Beamer, Dirk) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Defendants (Beamer, Dirk) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Beamer, Dirk) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Sigma Powertrain, Inc.* (TTho) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Crane Carrier Company against Sigma Powertrain, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8483976 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Purchase Order, #3 Exhibit B - Receipt - Payment Details, #4 Exhibit C - Email re: canceling order) (Boettcher, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crane Carrier Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Joseph Boettcher