This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2023 at 09:07:17 (UTC).

Craig v. A.W. Chesterton Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 Craig filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W Chesterton Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and Sonja F. Bivins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00462

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey U. Beaverstock

Referral Judge

Sonja F. Bivins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gloria Craig

Defendants

Paramount Global

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

Redco Corporation

ETC Sunoco Holdings LLC

Valves and Controls US, Inc.

A.W. Chesterton Company

Alabama Shipyard, LLC

BAE Systems Inc.

Carrier Corporation

ViacomCBS Inc.

CBS Corporation

Westinghouse Electric Corporation

Gulf Oil Corporation

Crane Co.

Texaco, Inc.

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation

Foster Wheeler LLC

Elliott Company

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Ross Griffith

Attorney at Beasley Allen Law Firm

301 St. Louis St

Mobile, AL 36602

Charles P. Stern

Attorney at Beasley Allen et al

218 W. Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36103

Defendant Attorneys

James A. Harris, III

Attorney at Watkins and Eager PLLC

1904 First Avenue North, Suite 300

Birmingham, AL 35203

Nicole Mapp Hardee

Attorney at Watkins & Eager PLLC

1904 First Avenue North, Suite 300

Birmingham, AL 35203

Mary R. Arthur

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz, LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Michael H. Abraham

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Peter A. Moir

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue,, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Timothy A. Clarke

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, LLC

11 North Water Street

F. Grey Redditt, Jr.

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, LLC

11 North Water Street

B. Adam Hayes

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg, LLC

1700 South 28Th Avenue, Suite D

Hattiesburg, MS 36402

C. Paul Cavender

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Suite 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203-3284

James G. House, III

Attorney at Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC

100 Vision Drive, Suite 200

Jackson, MS 39211

Chelsea C. Lewis

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Jennifer M. Studebaker

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz, LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Other Attorneys

Brian P. McCarthy

Attorney at McDowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.

P.O. Box 350

Mobile, AL 36601

Frederick George Helmsing, Jr.

Attorney at McDowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.

P.O. Box 350

Mobile, AL 36601

Allan R. Wheeler

Attorney at Hall, Booth, Smith, P.C.

2001 Park Place North, Suite 870

Birmingham, AL 35203

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Clarke, Timothy) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#66

(#66) ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: Stipulation of Dismissal #65 . Plaintiffs claims against Keystone Shipping Co. and Keystone Tankship Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. All claims against all other parties shall proceed. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 01/13/2023. (cjr) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

65 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#65

(#65) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff and by Keystone Tankship Corporation, Keystone Shipping Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hails, Edward) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#64

(#64) ORDER DISMISSING PARTY re: Stipulation of Dismissal #63 (with the court construing this as a request for dismissal under Rule 41(a)(2) filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corp are dismissed without prejudice. All claims against all other parties shall proceed. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 1/12/23. (cmj) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#63

(#63) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff and by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Strain, Stacey) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#61

(#61) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Alabama Shipyard, LLC. (Cavender, C.) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

58 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#58

MOTIONS REFERRED: #58 MOTION for James Rebarchak to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel (C. Paul Cavender) Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

1 #15

Supplement State Court Case Action Summary

1 #14

Supplement State Court Docs 353-366

1 #12

Supplement State Court Docs 280-306

1 #10

Supplement State Court Docs 203-250

1 #9

Supplement State Court Docs 193-202

1 #8

Supplement State Court Docs 180-192

1 #7

Supplement State Court Docs 151-179

1 #4

Supplement State Court Docs 55-102

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Clarke, Timothy) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: Stipulation of Dismissal #65 . Plaintiffs claims against Keystone Shipping Co. and Keystone Tankship Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. All claims against all other parties shall proceed. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 01/13/2023. (cjr) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff and by Keystone Tankship Corporation, Keystone Shipping Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hails, Edward) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ORDER DISMISSING PARTY re: Stipulation of Dismissal #63 (with the court construing this as a request for dismissal under Rule 41(a)(2) filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corp are dismissed without prejudice. All claims against all other parties shall proceed. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 1/12/23. (cmj) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff and by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Strain, Stacey) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Document endorsed NOTED by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #61 filed by Alabama Shipyard, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Alabama Shipyard, LLC. (Cavender, C.) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ENDORSED ORDER granting #58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 01/06/2023. (srd) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Docket(#59) ENDORSED ORDER granting Martin E. Burke's Motion to Withdraw as counsel for BAE Systems, Inc. 5 . Martin Emmett Burke terminated as counsel for BAE Systems, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/56/2023. (Bivins, Sonja) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #58 MOTION for James Rebarchak to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel (C. Paul Cavender) Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Document endorsed NOTED by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by General Electric Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Jones on behalf of General Electric Company (Jones, Sarah) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant General Electric Company. (Jones, Sarah) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joinder in NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Electric Company (), filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Product ID Sheet, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Cover Letter) (Jones, Sarah) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer to be filed by Paramount Global pursuant to FRCP 81(c). (cmj) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Document endorsed NOTED by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Paramount Global and Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.. (Strain, Stacey) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joinder in NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation and Notice of Removal (), filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Answers to Defendants' Joint First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Gloria Craig) (Strain, Stacey) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Paramount Global. (Harris, James) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-3104328, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Paramount Global. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement State Court Docs 1-54, #4 Supplement State Court Docs 55-102, #5 Supplement State Court Docs 103-127, #6 Supplement State Court Docs 128-150, #7 Supplement State Court Docs 151-179, #8 Supplement State Court Docs 180-192, #9 Supplement State Court Docs 193-202, #10 Supplement State Court Docs 203-250, #11 Supplement State Court Docs 251-279, #12 Supplement State Court Docs 280-306, #13 Supplement State Court Docs 307-352, #14 Supplement State Court Docs 353-366, #15 Supplement State Court Case Action Summary) (Harris, James) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDCO CORPORATION FKA CRANE CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where BAE SYSTEMS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GULF OIL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION is a litigant