This case was last updated from PACER on 10/09/2021 at 08:59:12 (UTC).

Craig Hospital et al v. Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Craig Hospital filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02175

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Craig Hospital

CNS Medical Group, PC

Defendants

Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc.

United Health Group, Inc.

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R. Craig Ewing

Attorney at Ewing Law, PC

3900 South Wadsworth Boulevard, Suite 370

Lakewood, CO 80235

Defendant Attorneys

Adam P. Feinberg

Attorney at Miller & Chevalier Chtd.

900 16Th Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

John C. West

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Phoenix

201 East Washington Street, Suite 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2595

Nicole King Gorham

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie

1601 19Th Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Feinberg, Adam) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

11 #5

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

11 #4

Exhibit A - U.S. Statement of Interest

11 #3

Decl. of C. Lewis

11 #2

Decl. of J. Johnson

11 #1

Decl. of B. Aguilar Thompson

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gorham, Nicole) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John C. West on behalf of United Health Group, Inc.Attorney John C. West added to party United Health Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (West, John) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint And Jury Demand by Defendants United Health Group, Inc., Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc.. All Defendants. (Gorham, Nicole) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicole King Gorham on behalf of United Health Group, Inc.Attorney Nicole King Gorham added to party United Health Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Gorham, Nicole) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Feinberg, Adam) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam P. Feinberg on behalf of Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc.Attorney Adam P. Feinberg added to party Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc.(pty:dft) (Feinberg, Adam) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 August 2021. Consent Form due by 11/2/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/9/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

3 #2

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

3 #1

Summons

3 #3

Main Document

1 #2

Summons Summons GEHA

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-2175-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Feinberg, Adam) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc., United Health Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of B. Aguilar Thompson, #2 Decl. of J. Johnson, #3 Decl. of C. Lewis, #4 Exhibit A - U.S. Statement of Interest, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Feinberg, Adam) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gorham, Nicole) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John C. West on behalf of United Health Group, Inc.Attorney John C. West added to party United Health Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (West, John) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint And Jury Demand by Defendants United Health Group, Inc., Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc.. All Defendants. (Gorham, Nicole) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicole King Gorham on behalf of United Health Group, Inc.Attorney Nicole King Gorham added to party United Health Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Gorham, Nicole) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Feinberg, Adam) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam P. Feinberg on behalf of Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc.Attorney Adam P. Feinberg added to party Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc.(pty:dft) (Feinberg, Adam) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 August 2021. Consent Form due by 11/2/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/9/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against John Doe, Governmental Employees Health Association, Inc., United Health Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number BCODC-8014392)Attorney R. Craig Ewing added to party CNS Medical Group, PC(pty:pla), Attorney R. Craig Ewing added to party Craig Hospital(pty:pla), filed by Craig Hospital, CNS Medical Group, PC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons UHC, #2 Summons Summons GEHA, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ewing, R.) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Craig Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases where GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES HEALTH ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTH GROUP AND ASSOCIATES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole King Gorham