This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/12/2020 at 08:42:12 (UTC).

Craig et al v. Briggs & Stratton Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 Craig filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Briggs Stratton Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00240

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diana Craig

Amy Craig

Troy Craig

Defendants

ABL Holdings, LLC

Briggs & Stratton Corporation

Wood Industries, Inc.

Spray Foam Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Robert Samples

Attorney at Samples Ames PLLC

2727 Lbj Freeway, Suite 922

Dallas, TX 75234

James R Ames, III

Attorney at Samples Ames PLLC

860 Hebron Parkway, Suite 1103

Lewisville, TX 75057

David G Hart

Attorney at The Hart Law Firm PC

6620 Colleyville Blvd., Suite 100

Colleyville, TX 76034

Michael Alan Simpson

Attorney at Simpson Simpson & Penepacker

1119 Halsell Street

Bridgeport, TX 76426

Defendant Attorneys

Scott A Knight

Attorney at Knight Law

2850 W. Horizon Ridge Pkwy, Ste. 200

Henderson, NV 89052

Lauren M Loew

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER LLP

321 N. Clark St., Ste. 3000

Chicago, IL 60654-4762

Abigail Kaitlin Drake

Attorney at Foley Gardere / Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Jason Paul Sharp

Attorney at Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP

1000 Louisiana, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77002

George N Wilson, III

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

700 N Pearl Street 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

 

Court Documents

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #15

Exhibit(s) Exhibit B

1 #14

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A

1 #13

Exhibit(s) Volume 11

1 #12

Exhibit(s) Volume 10

1 #11

Exhibit(s) Volume 9 - Certificate of Interested Persons

1 #10

Exhibit(s) Volume 8

1 #9

Exhibit(s) Volume 7

1 #8

Exhibit(s) Volume 6

1 #7

Exhibit(s) Volume 5

1 #6

Exhibit(s) Volume 4

1 #5

Exhibit(s) Volume 3 - Docket Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit(s) Volume 2

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #5 Corrected Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (tln) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORRECTED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re: #2 Notice (Other) filed by Troy Craig, Diana Craig, Amy Craig (Samples, Steven) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Mar 16 14:49:42 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to submit a status report on or before March 17, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/16/2020) (skg) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Mon Mar 16 10:25:38 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Dismissal (Voluntary) filed by Troy Craig (Samples, Steven) (Entered: 03/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Briggs & Stratton Corporation. (see doc. #1 for image) (tln) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 271st Judicial District, case number CV20-02-075 filed by Briggs & Stratton Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10701688) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) Index, #4 Exhibit(s) Volume 2, #5 Exhibit(s) Volume 3 - Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit(s) Volume 4, #7 Exhibit(s) Volume 5, #8 Exhibit(s) Volume 6, #9 Exhibit(s) Volume 7, #10 Exhibit(s) Volume 8, #11 Exhibit(s) Volume 9 - Certificate of Interested Persons, #12 Exhibit(s) Volume 10, #13 Exhibit(s) Volume 11, #14 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #15 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Drake, Abigail) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIGGS & STRATTON CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Alan Simpson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Robert Samples