This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2020 at 08:14:22 (UTC).

Craig Cunningham v. Technologic USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 Craig Cunningham filed an Other lawsuit against Technologic USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly H Rankin and Nancy D Freudenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00231

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wyoming District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

Presiding Judge

Nancy D Freudenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Craig Cunningham

Plano, TX 75075

Defendants

Technologic USA, Inc.

John/Jane Does

 

Court Documents

19 #5

envelope

19 #4

Exhibit H

19 #3

Exhibit G-1

19 #2

Exhibit F

19 #1

Exhibit D

#19

(#19) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G-1, #4 Exhibit H, #5 envelope) (Court Staff, skb) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

18 #1

*Restricted*

#18

(#18) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-05597. (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin transferring case to District of Wyoming. IT IS ORDERED THAT the Clerk shall transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#15

(#15) PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE REGARDING PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#14

(#14) PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Technologic USA, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#13

(#13) PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#12

(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: TRANSFER TO PROPER VENUE OR DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED that, no later than September 24, 2019, plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint addressing the deficiencies noted above. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of a First Amended Complaint that addresses the issues raised in this Order on or before the date indicated above. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. Hearing set 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin.(yl) Modified on 9/13/2019 (cw). [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for default judgment no later than 8/29/2019, and notice it for hearing pursuant to the Local Rules. (vdr) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#9

(#9) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Technologic USA, Inc. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 08/15/2019)

1 #1

CV-71

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendants John/Jane Does, Technologic USA, Inc. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G-1, #4 Exhibit H, #5 envelope) (Court Staff, skb) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-05597. (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin transferring case to District of Wyoming. IT IS ORDERED THAT the Clerk shall transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment by the Court #11 , currently set for hearing on October 3, 2019, is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE REGARDING PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Technologic USA, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: TRANSFER TO PROPER VENUE OR DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED that, no later than September 24, 2019, plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint addressing the deficiencies noted above. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of a First Amended Complaint that addresses the issues raised in this Order on or before the date indicated above. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. Hearing set 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin.(yl) Modified on 9/13/2019 (cw). [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for default judgment no later than 8/29/2019, and notice it for hearing pursuant to the Local Rules. (vdr) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Technologic USA, Inc. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Defendant Technologic USA, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham, upon Defendant Technologic USA, Inc. served on 7/20/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Julie K. Bridge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • (#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Technologic USA, Inc. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendants John/Jane Does, Technologic USA, Inc. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less