This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 08:39:01 (UTC).

Craft v. St. Jude Children's Research Hospital

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Craft filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against St Jude Children's Research Hospital. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Sheryl H. Lipman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02453

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lee A. Craft

Memphis, TN 38125

Defendant

St. Jude Children's Research Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa A. Krupicka

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Sarah Elizabeth Stuart

Attorney at BURCH, PORTER & JOHNSON

130 North Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 Facts and EEOC Charge of Discrimination

1 #2

Exhibit 2 EEOC Notice of Right to Sue

1 #3

Judicial Cards

#2

(#2) Case initiation fee: PAID $ 402.00, receipt number M4676052486 (csf) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE: Signed agreement to receive notice of electronic filing (NEF) by Lee A. Craft (csf) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to St. Jude Children's Research Hospital. The filer was given the issued summons in order to effect service. (csf) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Krupicka on behalf of All Defendants (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Stuart on behalf of St. Jude Children's Research Hospital (Stuart, Sarah) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#10

(#10) SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Tuesday, August 23, 2022 at 1:30 P.M. (CST) via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts for any questions.(smm) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by St. Jude Children's Research Hospital.(Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by St. Jude Children's Research Hospital.(Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE CANCELLING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): The Scheduling Conference currently set for Tuesday, August 23, 2022 at 1:30 P.M. (CST) via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman has been cancelled. (smm) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Tuesday, August 23, 2022 at 1:30 P.M. (CST) via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts for any questions.(smm) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Stuart on behalf of St. Jude Children's Research Hospital (Stuart, Sarah) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Krupicka on behalf of All Defendants (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to St. Jude Children's Research Hospital. The filer was given the issued summons in order to effect service. (csf) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketPursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE: Signed agreement to receive notice of electronic filing (NEF) by Lee A. Craft (csf) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case initiation fee: PAID $ 402.00, receipt number M4676052486 (csf) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 2000ra filed by Lee A. Craft against St. Jude Children's Research Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Facts and EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2 EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Judicial Cards)(csf) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST JUDE CHILDRENS RESEARCH HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa A. Krupicka

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Elizabeth Stuart