This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2021 at 07:19:25 (UTC).

Craddieth v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Craddieth filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02482

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elbert Craddieth

Defendants

Oportun, Inc.

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

TransUnion LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Celetha Chatman

Attorney at Community Lawyers Group, Ltd.

20 North Clark Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Nabil G. Foster

Attorney at Barron & Newburger P.C.

53 W. Jackson Blvd., #1205

Chicago, IL 60604

Alisann Anderson

Attorney at Jones Day

77 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60654

Laura K. Rang

Attorney at Trans Union, LLC

555 W. Adams Street

Chicago, IL 60661

Scott Edwin Brady

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, P.c.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit s A-B

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Pursuant to notice of settlement as between plaintiff and defendant Oportun, Inc., its motion for extension of time to answer #11 is denied as moot. Motion of defendant Experian for extension of time to 7/16/2021 to answer #14 is granted. Scheduling conference previously set for 7/9/2021 is reset to 8/13/2021 at 09:45 AM (for tracking purposes only; no appearances will be required). The parties shall file by 8/4/2021 1) a joint status report informing the court of the status of settlement with Oportun, Inc. 2) and a joint Rule 26(f) planning report (the form of which can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov). The court will set a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Settlement As To Defendant, Oportun, Inc. Only by Elbert Craddieth (Chatman, Celetha) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elbert Craddieth as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Chatman, Celetha) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Anderson, Alisann) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Anderson, Alisann) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Alisann Anderson (Anderson, Alisann) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Oportun, Inc. (Foster, Nabil) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Defendant Oportun, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 UNOPPOSED Motion (Foster, Nabil) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oportun, Inc. by Nabil G. Foster (Foster, Nabil) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TransUnion LLC (Brady, Scott) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion LLC(Brady, Scott) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TransUnion LLC by Laura K. Rang (Rang, Laura) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TransUnion LLC by Scott Edwin Brady (Brady, Scott) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 7/9/2021 at 09:45 AM (for tracking purposes only; no appearance will be required). Joint Rule 26(f) planning report due 7/2/2021. (The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.) The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elbert Craddieth as to TransUnion LLC on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Chatman, Celetha) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elbert Craddieth as to Oportun, Inc. on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Chatman, Celetha) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Oportun, Inc., TransUnion LLC (crl, ) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Elbert Craddieth by Celetha Chatman (Chatman, Celetha) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Elbert Craddieth ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18222956. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chatman, Celetha) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TransUnion Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Celetha Chatman