This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2021 at 11:27:53 (UTC).

CR Bard v. Smiths Medical ASD

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 CR Bard filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Smiths Medical ASD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01543

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants and Plaintiffs

CR Bard

Bard Peripheral Vascular

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Smiths Medical ASD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian P. Egan

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Kimberly Neville

Bryon J. Benevento

Matthew A. Traupman

Steven C. Cherny

Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

R. Jan Pirozzolo-Mellowes

Cortlan S. Hitch

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Ave, Ste 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michelle A. Moran

 

Court Documents

#242

#241

#240

#239

#238

#237

5 #3

Text of Proposed Order

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

4 #1

Exhibit Copy of Complaint

#4

#3

2 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

#1

442 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys R. Jan Pirozzolo-Mellowes an dMichelle A. Moran for Smiths Medical ASD added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #242 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren Martin filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, CR Bard. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/16/2020. (fms) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #240 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey N. Costakos, Attorney R. Jan Pirozzolo-Mellowes and Attorney Michelle A. Moran filed by Smiths Medical ASD. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/16/2020. (fms) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#242) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren Martin - filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, CR Bard. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#241) Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/21/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall coordinate the call and email the dial-in information to chambers. If the parties have no disputes about the scheduling order, the Court will not require the parties to appear at a conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/16/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01543-CFC, 1:20-cv-01544-CFC(nmf) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#240) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey N. Costakos, Attorney R. Jan Pirozzolo-Mellowes and Attorney Michelle A. Moran - filed by Smiths Medical ASD. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#239) NOTICE of Appearance by Cortlan S. Hitch on behalf of Smiths Medical ASD (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#238) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Laurence Dorsney on behalf of Smiths Medical ASD (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Kimberly Neville,Bryon J. Benevento for Bard Peripheral Vascular and CR Bard. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01543-CFC, 1:20-cv-01544-CFC(mal) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#237) Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request for an Order leading to scheduling. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
223 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by CR Bard as to Smiths Medical ASD served on 1/19/2012, answer due 2/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons)(Benevento, Bryon) [Transferred from Utah on 11/17/2020.] (Entered: 01/30/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Related Cases Pursuant to DUCivR 83-2(g) by CR Bard (Neville, Kimberly) [Transferred from Utah on 11/17/2020.] (Entered: 01/24/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Smiths Medical ASD. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (rls) [Transferred from Utah on 11/17/2020.] (Entered: 01/18/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 , #6 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven C. Cherny,Amanda Hollis for CR Bard. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba on 1/18/12. (alp) [Transferred from Utah on 11/17/2020.] (Entered: 01/18/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda Hollis , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1508304, filed by Plaintiff CR Bard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Benevento, Bryon) [Transferred from Utah on 11/17/2020.] (Entered: 01/12/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven Cherny , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1508299, filed by Plaintiff CR Bard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Benevento, Bryon) [Transferred from Utah on 11/17/2020.] (Entered: 01/12/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Complaint) (jds) [Transferred from Utah on 11/17/2020.] (Entered: 01/12/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff CR Bard identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Neville, Kimberly) [Transferred from Utah on 11/17/2020.] (Entered: 01/11/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Smiths Medical ASD (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 1088-1507277), filed by CR Bard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba (Neville, Kimberly) [Transferred from Utah on 11/17/2020.] (Entered: 01/11/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba. Plaintiff CR Bard is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 350.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jds) [Transferred from Utah on 11/17/2020.] (Entered: 01/11/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Smiths Medical ASD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortlan S. Hitch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle Anne Moran

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth Laurence Dorsney