This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2020 at 18:18:13 (UTC).

Cox v. USA

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 Cox filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barry A. Bryant and Robert T. Dawson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-06070

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barry A. Bryant

Presiding Judge

Robert T. Dawson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Connie Cox

Aliceville, AL 35442

Defendant

USA

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER a set forth. ***Civil Case Terminated: Motion to be filed in 6:16cr60023. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 17, 2020. (lw) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Compassionate Release by Connie Cox. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mll) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

2 #1

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00775. Docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Compassionate Release filed by Connie Cox. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 6/30/2020.] (Entered: 06/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER a set forth. ***Civil Case Terminated: Motion to be filed in 6:16cr60023. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 17, 2020. (lw) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Compassionate Release by Connie Cox. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mll) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00775. Docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Compassionate Release filed by Connie Cox. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 6/30/2020.] (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less